Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02515
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JAMAL MCCAIN
7343 Sharma Valley
San Antonio, TX 78252
Represented By
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/01 3:57 PM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6760175.), filed by JAMAL MCCAIN. (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet