New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:22-cv-01124
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Terminated:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By
Kayasha Lyons
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Morangelli
Represented By
James Ticchio
Sherman & Ticchio PLLC
contact info
Brett David Sherman
Sherman & Ticchio PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Discover Financial Services Inc.
Terminated: 08/08/2022
Represented By
Arjun P. Rao
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Sarah Bouskila
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 07/01/2022
Represented By
Adam Theodore Hill
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Courtney Sophie Stieber
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 07/14/2022
Represented By
Camille Renee Nicodemus
Schuckit & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/28 10:19 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE -- As stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiff Anthony Morangelli and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc in the41 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed on September 27, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/28/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/27 11:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Experian by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
40 40 misc Status Report Wed 08/10 2:42 PM
STATUS REPORT to update the Court about the current state of Plaintiffs case against each Defendant by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
order Order Dismissing Parties Mon 08/08 5:54 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES -- As stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiff Anthony Morangelli and Defendant Discover Bank, sued as Discover Financial Services Inc., in the39 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed on August 5, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against Defendant Discover Bank, sued as Discover Financial Services Inc., with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 8/8/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/05 9:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
order Status Report Order Wed 08/03 10:25 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter as to Defendant Discover Financial Services Inc. by 8/16/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/3/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
38 38 misc Status Report Tue 08/02 6:19 PM
STATUS REPORT by Discover Financial Services Inc. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 08/02 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement in Principle between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 08/02 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties report this matter has settled as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter by 10/2/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/2/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
order Status Report Order Thu 07/28 10:38 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff Anthony Morangelli and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall file a status report letter by 8/10/2022 . Parties to indicate the status of ongoing settlement discussions and whether they would like a referral to Court-annexed mediation or a settlement conference at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 7/28/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
36 36 misc Status Report Wed 07/27 8:37 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on behalf of Plaintiff and Defendant Experian by Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Lyons, Kayasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
order Order Dismissing Parties Thu 07/14 5:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES -- As stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiff Anthony Morangelli and Defendant Trans Union, LLC in the35 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed on July 13, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against Defendant Trans Union, LLC, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 7/14/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/13 1:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC by Trans Union LLC (Nicodemus, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 01, 2022
order Order Dismissing Parties Fri 07/01 11:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES -- As stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiff Anthony Morangelli and Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC in the34 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed on June 30, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 7/1/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/30 9:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC Only by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
order Status Report Order Fri 06/03 10:53 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties report this matter has settled as to defendant Discover Bank, listed on the docket as "Discover Financial Services Inc." Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter by 8/2/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 6/3/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 06/02 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement in Principle between Plaintiff and Discover Bank, which was erroneously sued as Discover Financial Services Inc. Only by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
32 32 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/27 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement in Principle between Plaintiff and Trans Union LLC Only by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 05/27 12:37 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties report (Dkt.31 ) this matter has settled with defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. Accordingly, a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter is due by 7/19/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/27/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 05/27 12:39 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties report (Dkt.32 ) this matter has settled with defendant Trans Union LLC. Accordingly, a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter is due by 7/27/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/27/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 05/19 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement in Principle between Plaintiff and Equifax Information Services LLC Only by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/18 12:06 PM
ORDER re27 : Plaintiff and Defendant Discover Bank's Motion to Stay is granted. All deadlines and proceedings with respect to Defendant Discover Bank are stayed pending the completion of arbitration. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/18/2022. (Maneval, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/27 11:20 AM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/27/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by James Ticchio for plaintiff; Adam Theodore Hill for Equifax Information Services LLC; Kayasha Lyons for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Camille Renee Nicodemus for Trans Union LLC; and Sarah Bouskila for Discover Financial Services Inc. (Discover). The Court entered the following pretrial schedule as to all defendants except for Discover: no amendment of the pleadings or joinder of additional parties permitted after 6/21/2022; and parties to complete fact discovery by 9/26/2022. Parties to submit a joint status report by 7/27/2022 and shall inform the Court whether they would like a referral to Court-annexed mediation or a settlement conference at that time. Parties also to notify the Court in the status report whether they anticipate retaining experts and shall propose an expert discovery schedule, if necessary. The Court has taken Discover's motion to stay (Dkt. 27) pending arbitration under advisement. (AT&T Conference Bridge.) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
30 30 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/21 10:38 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Anthony Morangelli (Ticchio, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/15 4:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/15 12:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Lyons, Kayasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
27 27 motion Stay Tue 04/12 5:43 PM
MOTION to Stay re1 Complaint, As To Discover Bank Pending The Completion Of Arbitration by Discover Financial Services Inc.. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/24 11:18 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, on consent by Discover Financial Services Inc.. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/24 11:14 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discover Financial Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Discover Financial Services, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Discover Financial Services Inc.. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/24 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Bouskila on behalf of Discover Financial Services Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bouskila, Sarah)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/24 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun P. Rao on behalf of Discover Financial Services Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/24 5:58 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Discover Financial Services Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/24/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/22 3:21 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/22 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/22 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Theodore Hill on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/22 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Sophie Stieber on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (aty to be noticed) (Stieber, Courtney)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/22 4:41 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/22/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/15 3:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on 4/27/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 4/25/2022 . Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334 . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/15/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Chamber's Individual Rules
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/15 11:55 AM
Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/10 10:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/10 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/08 1:22 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Lyons, Kayasha)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/08 1:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Lyons, Kayasha)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/08 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayasha Lyons on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc (aty to be noticed) (Lyons, Kayasha)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/08 4:16 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/8/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/07 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Morangelli. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/07 1:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Morangelli. Trans Union LLC served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/07 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Ticchio on behalf of Anthony Morangelli (aty to be noticed) (Ticchio, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/07 9:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Morangelli. Discover Financial Services Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/07 9:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Morangelli. Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/02 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Discover Financial Services Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/02 4:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 03/02 4:10 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/02 1:18 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/02 1:16 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Anthony Morangelli (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15337593 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anthony Morangelli. (Sherman, Brett)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/02 4:09 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]