Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:22-cv-00134
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause49:14706 Liability of Carriers Under Receipts and Bills of Lading
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Able Moving and Storage, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Capriati
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Purdy
Represented By
Bridgette Mannino Blitch
Blitch Westley, S.C.
contact info
Ellis R. Faught, III
Blitch Westley Barrette, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
68 68 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 02/20 2:01 PM
ORDER appointing Emmett Lamar Battles as arbiter in this action. The Clerk must add ebattles@zinoberdiana.com to the docket for notifications and send a copy of this Order to Mr. Battles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 2/20/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
67 67 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/16 1:14 PM
NOTICE by Raymond Purdy re66 Order JOINT NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SELECTION OF ARBITER (Faught, Ellis)
Related: [-]