Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02610
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT REARDON
6 Equestrian Ave
MASHPEE, MA 02649
Represented By
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 04, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/04 8:52 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6763364.), filed by ROBERT REARDON. (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet