New Jersey District Court
Judge:Noel L Hillman
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:22-cv-01151
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Re-opened:Jan 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
MRS BPO, L.L.C
Represented By
MONICA M. LITTMAN
Kaufman Dolowich Voluck LLP
contact info
RICHARD J. PERR
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
ALEKSANDER P. POWIETRZYNSKI
Winston & Winston, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER WAGGETT
Represented By
JOSEPH K. JONES
Jones, Wolf & Kapasi, LLC
contact info
BENJAMIN JARRET WOLF
Jones, Wolf & Kapasi, LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 11 2022
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/11/2022. (alb, )

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, January 13, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 01/17 9:48 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (2). Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/2023. (alb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 10/25 4:12 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/25/2022. (alb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Mon 10/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement was filed by JENNIFER WAGGETT (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 08/12 9:29 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/11/2022. (alb, )
Related: [-]
25 25 23 pgs order Opinion Fri 08/12 9:27 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/11/2022. (alb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/14 12:23 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER confirming that parties respective discovery responses will be due on or before August 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/14/2022. (alb)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 07/14 11:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/14/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/14 11:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having conducted a telephone status conference with the parties, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the scheduling deadlines in the current Scheduling Order, ECF No. 14, shall remain in effect. The Court will modify the current schedule, if necessary, depending on the status of Defendants pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. The Court will hold a telephone status conference on October 27, 2022, at 10:30 AM. Counsel shall use the following dial-in information: 888-684-8852 access code 1051623#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/14/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 07/11 12:17 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by MRS BPO, L.L.C re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (PERR, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
order Order Tue 06/28 10:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 10:30 AM , has been reassigned to Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Counsel shall use the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code 1051623# . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/28/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation Mon 06/27 10:38 AM
STIPULATION that discovery responses will be due on or before August 12, 2022 by MRS BPO, L.L.C. (LITTMAN, MONICA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 06/24 9:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (DS, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
19 19 misc Substitution of Attorney Tue 06/21 2:29 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ALEKSANDER P. POWIETRZYNSKI terminated. Attorney RICHARD J. PERR,MONICA M. LITTMAN for MRS BPO, L.L.C added.. (PERR, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 19, 2022
18 18 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Sun 06/19 8:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JENNIFER WAGGETT re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings was filed (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
17 17 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Mon 06/06 9:16 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (WOLF, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/06 10:14 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 7/18/2022 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
16 16 service Certificate of Service Fri 06/03 6:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MRS BPO, L.L.C re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 06/03 6:02 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by MRS BPO, L.L.C. Responses due by 6/21/2022(POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint with Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit Copy of Answer
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/03 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/10/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/3/2022. (alb)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/03 1:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2022. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/26 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN JARRET WOLF on behalf of JENNIFER WAGGETT (WOLF, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 04/26 1:59 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by JENNIFER WAGGETT.(WOLF, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 04/14 10:02 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO, L.L.C identifying MRS Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Thu 04/14 9:42 AM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by MRS BPO, L.L.C. (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 04/14 9:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 5/3/2022 at 10:30 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/14/2022. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
7 7 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 04/11 12:14 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/3/2022 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/11/2022. (alb)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/11 12:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by MRS BPO, L.L.C.(POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 03/28 11:29 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint against MRS BPO LLC. Attorney ALEKSANDER P. POWIETRZYNSKI for MRS BPO, L.L.C added. (POWIETRZYNSKI, ALEKSANDER)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/28 2:37 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MRS BPO, L.L.C has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2022. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/17 9:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER WAGGETT. MRS BPO, L.L.C served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/04 11:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MRS BPO, L.L.C. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 03/02 8:56 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by JENNIFER WAGGETT as to MRS BPO, L.L.C. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 8:54 PM
COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, L.L.C ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13226000) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JENNIFER WAGGETT.(JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/03 5:11 PM
Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]