Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark S Davis
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:22-cv-00094
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2022
Case in other court:Circuit Court for the City of Virginia Beach, CL22000207-00
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 6:53 AM EDT
Defendant
James H. Haliburton
Represented By
Nat Peter Calamis
Carr Maloney P.C.
contact info
Stephen G Rutigliano
Carr Maloney PC
contact info
Sarah Wood Conkright
Carr Maloney PC
contact info
Defendant
Silver Diner Development, LLC.
Represented By
Milena Radovic
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kristina H. Vaquera
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
B. T.
Represented By
Lauren Martin
Breit Biniazan PC
contact info
Kevin Biniazan
Breit Biniazan, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Silver Diner Development, Inc.
Terminated: 03/30/2022
Represented By
Milena Radovic
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kristina H. Vaquera
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Silver Diner Limited Partnership
Terminated: 03/30/2022
Represented By
Milena Radovic
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kristina H. Vaquera
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 05, 2022
68 68 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 12/05 3:00 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 12/5/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
67 67 motion Dismiss Fri 12/02 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by B. T..(Biniazan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order