Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02731
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DWAYNE HOLLER
Represented By
RACHAL GARCIA ROJAS
D Miller & Associates - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/09 2:11 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/03 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6769957.), filed by DWAYNE HOLLER. (ROJAS, RACHAL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet