Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 1:22-cv-00886
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Re-opened:Mar 27, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Emory University
Represented By
Rebecca Shanlever
Hall, Gilligan, Roberts & Shanlever LLP
contact info
Defendant
Director John Earles
Defendant
Director Heidi Faenza
Plaintiff
Jenny Lindsay
10595 Plantation Bridge Dr
Alpharetta, GA 30022
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Emory University School of Law
Terminated: 08/18/2022
Defendant
Georgia Office of Bar Admissions
Terminated: 08/18/2022
Represented By
Matthew William Bridges
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
139 139 misc Leave of Absence Fri 05/02 4:24 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/26, 5/27, 5/28, 5/29, 5/30, 6/2, 6/3, by Elizabeth M. Newton. (Newton, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
138 138 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 05/02 4:17 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jenny Lindsay filed by Emory University (Newton, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
137 137 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/28 12:53 PM
RESPONSE re134 MOTION to Consolidate CasesMOTION to Add PartyMOTION to Amend32 Amended Complaint, DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, ADD PARTIES, AND AMEND THE SECOND COMPLAINT filed by Emory University. (Newton, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
136 136 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 04/25 4:52 PM
RESPONSE in Support of134 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Add Party, MOTION to Amend32 Amended Complaint, filed by Jenny Lindsay. (jpa)
Related: [-]