Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02860
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ANTHONY LEAGANS
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/01 8:11 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 03/04 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of South Carolina by ANTHONY LEAGANS (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/04 12:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/04 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6774312.), filed by ANTHONY LEAGANS. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]