Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Lance M Africk
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:22-cv-00553
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Case in other court:32nd Judicial District Court, (985) 868-5660
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 4:35 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Anchor Diving & Construction, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Durkin Ledgard
Renshaw, P.C.
contact info
Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Koch & Schmidt, LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Charles Zamora
Represented By
Joseph Durkin Ledgard
Renshaw, P.C.
contact info
Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Koch & Schmidt, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Chester Plotner
Represented By
C. Berwick Duval, II
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Lovell, & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Stanwood R. Duval
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins
contact info
April A. Trahan
Duval Law Firm
contact info
Harley M. Papa
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tiffany Plotner
Represented By
C. Berwick Duval, II
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Lovell, & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Stanwood R. Duval
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins
contact info
April A. Trahan
Duval Law Firm
contact info
Harley M. Papa
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Anchor Diving & Construction, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Durkin Ledgard
Renshaw, P.C.
contact info
Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Koch & Schmidt, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Charles Zamora
Represented By
Joseph Durkin Ledgard
Renshaw, P.C.
contact info
Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Koch & Schmidt, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chester Plotner
Represented By
C. Berwick Duval, II
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Lovell, & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Stanwood R. Duval
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins
contact info
April A. Trahan
Duval Law Firm
contact info
Harley M. Papa
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Plotner
Represented By
C. Berwick Duval, II
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Lovell, & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Stanwood R. Duval
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins
contact info
April A. Trahan
Duval Law Firm
contact info
Harley M. Papa
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Splash Rentals, LLC
Represented By
C. Berwick Duval, II
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Lovell, & Watkins, Aplc
contact info
Stanwood R. Duval
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins
contact info
April A. Trahan
Duval Law Firm
contact info
Harley M. Papa
Duval, Funderburk, Sundbery, Richard & Watkins, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, September 02, 2022
52 52 minutes Status Conference Fri 09/02 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Status Conference held on 9/2/2022. (caa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
51 51 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Thu 09/01 9:46 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a Status Conference is scheduled for FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 2, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. This status conference will be conducted via video-conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/31/2022.(cwa)
Related: [-]