Texas Western District Court
Judge:Derek T Gilliland
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:22-cv-00240
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 4:09 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Open Text, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick M. Lafferty
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Mills
King & Spalding
contact info
Britton F. Davis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love PLLC
contact info
Brian J. Eutermoser
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Sprinkle
Sprinkle Ip Law Group
contact info
Christopher C. Campbell
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
OpenText Corp.
Counter Defendant
Webroot, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick M. Lafferty
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Mills
King & Spalding
contact info
Britton F. Davis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love PLLC
contact info
Brian J. Eutermoser
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Sprinkle
Sprinkle Ip Law Group
contact info
Christopher C. Campbell
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Sophos LTD
Represented By
Katherine Dominguez
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael M. Polka
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Brian Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Ryan Iwahashi
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Timothy P. Best
Gibson Dunn & Cruther LLP
contact info
Allyson E. Parks
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Benjamin Z. Bistricer
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Allen Kathir
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
J. Stephen Ravel
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sophos LTD
Represented By
Katherine Dominguez
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael M. Polka
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Brian Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Ryan Iwahashi
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Timothy P. Best
Gibson Dunn & Cruther LLP
contact info
Allyson E. Parks
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Benjamin Z. Bistricer
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Allen Kathir
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
J. Stephen Ravel
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Open Text, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick M. Lafferty
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Mills
King & Spalding
contact info
Britton F. Davis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love PLLC
contact info
Brian J. Eutermoser
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Sprinkle
Sprinkle Ip Law Group
contact info
Christopher C. Campbell
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Webroot, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick M. Lafferty
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Mills
King & Spalding
contact info
Britton F. Davis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love PLLC
contact info
Brian J. Eutermoser
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Sprinkle
Sprinkle Ip Law Group
contact info
Christopher C. Campbell
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
136 136 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Wed 03/20 12:20 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1)
Related: [-]
135 135 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/20 10:54 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Open Text, Inc., Webroot, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]