Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02939
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOHN REED
124 East Pomona St Apt.2
Philadelphia, PA 19144
Represented By
SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON
Clark Love & Hutson Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/01 11:50 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/04 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6776437.), filed by JOHN REED. (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet