Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 3:22-bk-10245
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022

Debtor
First Leads and Marketing, Inc.
PO Box 1108
Lagrange, GA 30241-0021
Represented By
J. Nevin Smith
Smith Conerly LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
James G. Baker
305 North Greenwood Street
LaGrange, GA 30240
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303

GPO Jun 23 2023
Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay (Related Doc 114). Related document(s) 122 Response to Motion, 123 Response to Motion, 124 Brief, 125 Response (not to motion). Service by BNC. Entered on 6/23/2023. (acj).

Docket last updated: 03/05/2022 12:03 AM EST
Friday, March 04, 2022
1 1 misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 03/04 1:19 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 338, Filed by J. Nevin Smith of Smith Conerly LLP on behalf of First Leads and Marketing, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/31/2022. (Smith, J.)
Related: [-]