Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03032
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MARC EDWARD PHENEY
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/29 3:09 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. Any motion to reopen must be filed on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case only by August 25, 2022. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 03/07 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Eastern District of Michigan by MARC EDWARD PHENEY (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/07 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/07 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6781670.), filed by MARC EDWARD PHENEY. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]