ROBBINS v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-03040 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jun 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
RYAN D ROBBINS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order Reopening Case
Mon 06/27 9:23 AM
ORDER - The motions for relief from judgment/motions for reconsideration and reinstatement filed by the plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to REOPEN the cases identified in Exhibit A and return them to the docket of the Court. Additionally, any plaintiff on Exhibit A who has not already submitted a DD214 or DoD Military Service Information Report must do so within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/27/2022. (djb) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Mon 06/27 10:52 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ. (djb) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/02 8:46 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION for Reconsideration re2 Order Dismissing Case (djb) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 06/01 7:38 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re2 Order Dismissing Case, by RYAN D ROBBINS. (ROJAS, RACHAL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Brief in Support | ||
3 | 3
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 06/01 7:31 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re2 Order Dismissing Case, by RYAN D ROBBINS. (ROJAS, RACHAL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Brief in Support | ||
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
30+
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/09 9:09 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/07 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6781930.), filed by RYAN D ROBBINS. (ROJAS, RACHAL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |