Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03066
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BRYAN GUARDIANO
Represented By
MICHAEL T GALLAGHER
The Gallagher Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 24 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/12 5:19 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/07 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6782806.), filed by BRYAN GUARDIANO. (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet