New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Referred: Jeremiah J Mccarthy
Case #: 1:22-cv-00187
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2022
Terminated:Dec 15, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Misook Kim
2120 Bridgeport Way
Torrance, CA 90503
Represented By
William C Mullen
Locke Lord Llp (ca)
contact info
Anthony D. Green
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Joseph Nicholas Froehlich
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Rory S. Miller
Locke Lord Llp (ca)
contact info
Mitchell J Popham
Locke Lord Llp (ca)
contact info
Alexander Asher Truitt
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Maria Annabel Mireles
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert Alin Pilkington
1281 Cabrillo Avenue Unit 401
Torrance, CA 90501
Represented By
Anthony D. Green
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Alexander Asher Truitt
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Maria Annabel Mireles
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Skyryse, Inc.
777 Aviation Blvd.
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Terrance P. Flynn
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Ilissa Samplin
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Cassandra M Baloga
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Justine M. Goeke
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Kelley M. Storey
Latham & Watkins (dc)
contact info
Arman Zahoory
Latham & Watkins Llp (menlo Park)
contact info
Michael M. Polka
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (park Ave)
contact info
Joseph H. Lee
Latham & Watkiins Llp (costa Mesa)
contact info
James P. Nonkes
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Angelique Kaounis
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Ryan T. Banks
Latham & Watkins Llp (menlo Park)
contact info
Douglas E. Lumish
Latham & Watkins Llp (menlo Park)
contact info
Gabriel S. Gross
Latham & Watkins Llp (menlo Park)
contact info
Josh Krevitt
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (park Ave)
contact info
Katherine Dominguez
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (park Ave)
contact info
Julianne Catherine Osborne
Latham & Watkins Llp (san Francisco)
contact info
Defendant
Does Nos. 1-50
Plaintiff
Moog Inc.
Represented By
Lai Lam Yip
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Fluskey, Jr.
Hodgson Russ, LLP
contact info
Kazim A. Naqvi
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Reetuparna Dutta
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info
Pauline Thecla Muto
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info
Rena Andoh
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Tyler Enright Baker
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Melissa Noel Subjeck
Hodgson Russ, LLP
contact info
Travis J. Anderson
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
298 298 misc Transcript Tue 03/28 6:08 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (DISCOVERY STATUS) held on 05/17/2022, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JEREMIAH J. MCCARTHY. Transcriber Karen J. Clark, RPR, KarenClark1013@AOL.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2023. (KJC)
Related: [-]