Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00678
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 08, 2022 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Keith Barton (1)
Represented By
Lucas J. Glaesman
Glaesman Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Nicholas R. Williams
Kessler Williams LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer Lauren Szczucinski
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/08/2022 1:23 AM CST
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to Keith Barton. (DLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on December 8, 2021 to Judge Matthew T. Schelp by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins as to Keith Barton (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. FORFEITURE ALLEGATION (DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on December 8, 2021 to Judge Matthew T. Schelp by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins as to Keith Barton (1): Former count 4 is now count 4r. Former count 5 is now count 5r. Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2 is now count 2r. Former count 3 is now count 3r.. (DLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jennifer Lauren Szczucinski appearing for USA. (DLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Keith Barton. (DLB)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order:...IT IS BY THE COURT ORDERED that said indictment shall be sealed and suppressed by the Clerk of the Court until said defendant is in custody or has given bail for the defendant's final appearance. Order as to Keith Barton. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on December 8, 2021. (DLB)
Related: [-]