West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 1:22-ap-00005
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2022
Terminated:Jun 30, 2022
Last checked: never
Cross-Claimant
Nicholas F. Ali
Represented By
Teresa J. Dumire
Kay Casto & Chaney, PLLC
contact info
Matthew D. Elshiaty
Kay Casto & Chaney, PLLC
contact info
Shannon P. Smith
Kay Casto & Chaney, PLLC
contact info
Eric M. Hayhurst
Hayhurst Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Micah A. McClain
Represented By
James Michael Benninger
Benninger Law
contact info
Defendant
Addey L. Bennett
Represented By
Mark Gaydos
contact info
Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Debra Tedeschi Varner
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ken Beck
Represented By
Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Debra Tedeschi Varner
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Strike, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Debra Tedeschi Varner
Varner & Van Volkenburg PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Damone N. Eddy, in his capacity as The Administrator and Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephanie N. Eddy
Represented By
Samuel D. Madia
Shaffer Madia Law PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Wesley Prince
Shaffer Madia Law PLLC
contact info
Joseph F. Shaffer
Shaffer Madia Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Allison M. Lippert
Represented By
Paul R Cranston
Cranston & Edwards, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America a/s/o Deborah and Francis Lippert
Represented By
Teresa D. Daniel
Law Office Of Asad U. Khan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, June 30, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/30 9:30 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (stb)
Related: [-]
court Case Closed Thu 06/30 9:30 AM
Case Closed . (stb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
33 33 court AP BNC Certificate of Service - Manual Sat 05/14 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Transmittal of Record Regarding Remand
Thursday, May 12, 2022
32 32 court AP BNC Certificate of Service - Manual Fri 05/13 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Transmittal of Record Regarding Remand
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 05/12 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Generic Order Re:
30 30 court Transmittal of Record Regarding Remand Wed 05/11 8:32 AM
Transmittal of Record (Certified Copies of Case Docket and Documents as Reflected in Transmittal of Record) Regarding Remand Served By US Mail On Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV Monongalia County Justice Center, 75 High Street Suite 12, Morgantown WV 26505 Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 28 Order to Remand
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/11 11:50 AM
Disposition of Adversary. (stb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
29 29 court Transmittal of Record Regarding Remand Tue 05/10 10:22 AM
Transmittal of Record (Certified Copies of Case Docket and Documents as Reflected in Transmittal of Record) Regarding Remand Served By US Mail On Jean Friend, Circuit Clerk of Monongalia County, Monongalia County Justice Center, 75 High Street, Suite 12, Morgantown WV 26505 Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 28 Generic Order Re:
Monday, May 09, 2022
28 28 2 pgs order Order (generic) Mon 05/09 4:56 PM
Agreed Order Remanding This Civil Action To The Circuit Court of Monongalia County, West Virginia1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy, Plaintiff Allison M. Lippert, Plaintiff Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America a/s/o Deborah and Francis Lippert. Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 1
27 27 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/09 2:58 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Jonathan Wesley Prince on behalf of Damone N. Eddy related document(s)14 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy, Plaintiff Allison M. Lippert,20 Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Micah A. McClain). (Prince, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 05/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Generic Order Re:
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order (generic) Tue 05/03 3:23 PM
Stipulation and Order Granting Extension of Deadline for the Strike Defendants to Respond to Motion to Remand to May 9, 2022.22 Generic Order Re:. Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, May 02, 2022
24 24 misc Stipulation Mon 05/02 5:30 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Granting Extension of Deadline for the Strike Defendants to Respond to Motion to Remand By Ken Beck, Addey L. Bennett, Strike, LLC and Between ALL PARTIES Filed by Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg on behalf of Ken Beck, Addey L. Bennett, Strike, LLC. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 24, 2022
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Service Mon 04/25 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Generic Order Re:
Friday, April 22, 2022
22 22 2 pgs order Order (generic) Fri 04/22 9:25 AM
Stipulation and Order Granting Extension of Deadline Until May 2, 2022 for the Strike Defendants to Respond to Motion To Remand; Replies are due by May 9, 2022.4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal. Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, April 21, 2022
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 04/21 1:31 PM
Stipulation and Order Granting Extension of Deadline for the Strike Defendants to Respond to Motion to Remand By Ken Beck, Addey L. Bennett, Strike, LLC and Between ALL PARTIES Filed by Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg on behalf of Ken Beck, Addey L. Bennett, Strike, LLC. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/20 9:21 AM
Defendant Micah A. McClain's Joinder in Plaintiffs Motion to Remand or in the Alternative to Abstain and Remand Filed by James Michael Benninger on behalf of Micah A. McClain. (Benninger, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
19 19 misc Report Mon 04/04 12:01 PM
Cross Claim Plaintiff Ali's Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand or in the Alternative to Abstain and Remand Filed by Eric M. Hayhurst on behalf of Nicholas F. Ali related document(s)14 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy, Plaintiff Allison M. Lippert). (Hayhurst, Eric)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 02, 2022
18 18 court AP BNC Certificate of Service - Manual Sun 04/03 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Generic Notice
Friday, April 01, 2022
17 17 misc Report Fri 04/01 2:03 PM
Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America's Joinder In Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Or In The Alternative To Abstain and Remand Filed by Teresa Darlene Daniel on behalf of Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America a/s/o Deborah and Francis Lippert related document(s)14 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy, Plaintiff Allison M. Lippert). (Daniel, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
16 16 court Generic Notice (COURT USER) Thu 03/31 9:34 AM
Notice Related [+]. Objections due by 4/21/2022. (stb)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy, Plaintiff Allison M. Lippert
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
15 15 misc Brief/Memorandum Wed 03/30 5:15 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by Samuel D. Madia, Jonathan Wesley Prince, Jonathan Wesley Prince on behalf of Damone N. Eddy and Allison M. Lippert. related document(s)14 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Damone N. Eddy). (Prince, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
14 14 motion Remand Wed 03/30 5:10 PM
Motion for Remand Or In The Alternative To Abstain and Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Damone N. Eddy and Allison M. Lippert. (Prince, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 21, 2022
13 13 misc Report Mon 03/21 9:39 PM
DEFENDANT KEN BECK'S RULE 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT Filed by Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg on behalf of Ken Beck. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report Mon 03/21 9:35 PM
DEFENDANT ADDEY L. BENNETT'S RULE 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT Filed by Mark Gaydos, Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg on behalf of Addey L. Bennett. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report Mon 03/21 2:31 PM
Nationwide Insurance Affinity Company of America's Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement Filed by Teresa Darlene Daniel on behalf of Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America a/s/o Deborah and Francis Lippert related document(s)4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal). (Daniel, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
10 10 misc Report Fri 03/18 9:22 AM
Nicholas F. Ali's Rule 9027 (e) (3) Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by Eric M. Hayhurst on behalf of Nicholas F. Ali. (Hayhurst, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
9 9 misc Report Thu 03/17 4:50 PM
Allison M. Lippert's Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by Paul R Cranston on behalf of Allison M. Lippert related document(s)4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal). (Cranston, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Report Thu 03/17 3:57 PM
Damone N. Eddy's Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement Filed by Jonathan Wesley Prince on behalf of Damone N. Eddy related document(s)4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal). (Prince, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
7 7 answer Response Mon 03/14 3:01 PM
Defendant Micah A. McClain's Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by James Michael Benninger on behalf of Micah A. McClain Related [+]. (Benninger, James)
Related: [-] 4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal
Friday, March 11, 2022
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Fri 03/11 11:35 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AR. Receipt Number 81849. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 03/11 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Concerning Notice of Removal
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Concerning Notice of Removal Tue 03/08 3:24 PM
Order Concerning Notice of Removal Providing for Statements Admitting or Denying Any Allegation That the Removal is Core or Non-Core to be Filed Within 14 Days From the Filing of the Notice of Removal AND Providing for Motions to Remand to be Filed Within 30 Days From the Filing of the Notice of Removal Related [+]. (stb)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 order Order Concerning Notice of Removal Tue 03/08 1:49 PM
Order Concerning Notice of Removal Providing for Statements Admitting or Denying Any Allegation That the Removal is Core or Non-Core to be Filed Within 14 Days From the Filing of the Notice of Removal AND Providing for Motions to Remand to be Filed Within 30 Days From the Filing of the Notice of Removal Related [+]. (jrm) Modified on 3/8/2022 (jrm)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/08 12:55 PM
Notice of Removal by Damone N. Eddy , Allison M. Lippert , Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America a/s/o Deborah and Francis Lippert . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350. . Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (jrm)
Related: [-]