DeFries v. MSB Trade Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara M G Lynn |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00549 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 05, 2022 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wang Yue Xia
|
|
Defendant
ShenZhen GuoHao Technology Development Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
ShenZhen ManManLi Cosmetics Limited
|
|
Defendant
ShenZhenShiJiHengDianZiShangWu Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Aoshang Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Baisite Network Technology Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Jingdu Network Technology Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Yingshihong Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenbaishenghongchangmaoyiyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Aodawo Shangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Fuheng E-commerce Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Honghaodianzishangwuyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Peiyun Keji Youxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhenshixinqitongdianzishangwuyouxianggongsi
|
|
Defendant
SEI Boutique LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wuhan Xiaqi Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Xuqian Xu
|
|
Defendant
Yiqingguan dianzishangwu youxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Jingqiao Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwushioumeidianzishangwuyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Yueqing Ogry International Trade Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Zhengding Xian Giaoling Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si
|
|
Defendant
Zhongshanshi Xiaomiao Dianzi Shangwu Youxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 - 50
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Tatuo Network Technology Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
He Siying
|
|
Defendant
Qingdao Haifusheng Commercial and Trading Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Shen Zhen Shi Xin Ji Hong Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Youzen Commerce Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Hefei hongteng wangluo keji you xian gong si
|
|
Defendant
Hefeinenxiongshangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Liaochengshichaoyueshangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Dequan Yu
|
|
Defendant
Dong Guan Shi Jia Sheng Dian Zi Shang Wu You Xian Gong si
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Haonuosen Network Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguanshijieshimeidianzikejiyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Gao YongXue
|
|
Defendant
GuTeng technology Co,Ltd
|
|
Defendant
GuangZhou ShiDe Trade Company Limited
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Dixian Garment Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Huiqi Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Yun He Trading Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Guizhoukaiyihaobangongjiajuyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
HiMo Direct
|
|
Defendant
Huizhou YLTD Logistics Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Jiangxi Pengxian Shiye Co.
|
|
Defendant
Jiarui_US
|
|
Defendant
Jiu Quan Lan Xin Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si
|
|
Defendant
Junhui Peng
|
|
Defendant
Liaocheng Kangyue Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
MSB Trade Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nanjing Good Stone Sink Decoration Engineering Co.
|
|
Defendant
Nanjingqianroubuliaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Pujiang Qiaoqiao Crystal Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Pujiang Ruiyi Hardware Tools Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Qiming Qin
|
|
Plaintiff
Kellie DeFries
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Shenzhen Shi Hongbisheng Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 08/18/2022
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
![]() Mail returned as undeliverable.130 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,127 Memorandum Opinion and Order,128 Default Judgment, received back from SEI Boutique LLC as Not Deliverable as Addressed. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (agc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |