Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03279
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2022 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
CALVIN COLCLOUGH
1845 Ida & Mary Mclawhorn Rd
GREENVILLE, NC 27858
Represented By
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/01 11:55 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/08 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6789950.), filed by CALVIN COLCLOUGH. (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet