Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03292
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2022 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
BRANDON YOUNG
2155 Century Dr
COLUMBUS, OH 43211
Represented By
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/01 11:55 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/08 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6790236.), filed by BRANDON YOUNG. (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet