California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:22-cv-00423
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2022
Terminated:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2022 3:11 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
David DesVerney
Represented By
Darin R Dominguez
Darin R Dominguez Law Offices
contact info
Counter Defendant
Kinect Renewable Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Richard T. Lobas
D'Amura And Zaidman PLLC
contact info
Richard A D'Amura
D'Amura And Zaidman PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Roes
Defendant
David DesVerney
Represented By
Darin R Dominguez
Darin R Dominguez Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Sologistics, LLC
Represented By
Darin R Dominguez
Darin R Dominguez Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Plaintiff
Kinect Renewable Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Richard T. Lobas
D'Amura And Zaidman PLLC
contact info
Richard A D'Amura
D'Amura And Zaidman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
79 79 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/04 9:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE78 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. All parties shall comply with the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. 2. Pursuant to this settlement agreement, the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice, and pursuant to the Court's own inherent powers, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A), the Court hereby retains jurisdiction to enforce the Parties' settlement agreement. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, except as may otherwise be provided in the settlement agreement between the parties. See order for details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
78 78 stip Dismiss Case Tue 01/03 1:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Resolved by a confidential settlement agreement filed by Plaintiff Kinect Renewable Solutions, LLC.(D'Amura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
77 77 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 01/03 1:14 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Dismiss76 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order submitted does not conform with the Courts Order. Filer must resubmit the Proposed Order in accordance with the Courts Procedures. Refer to Judges Procedures and Schedules Proposed Order Sample. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
76 76 stip Dismiss Case Tue 01/03 12:49 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Resolved by a confidential settlement agreement filed by Plaintiff Kinect Renewable Solutions, LLC.(D'Amura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order