Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Case #: 5:14-cv-00905
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2014
Terminated:Jan 09, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 8:46 PM CDT
Defendant
Robert Patton
Represented By
Aaron J Stewart
contact info
M Daniel Weitman
contact info
Defendant
Warden Anita Trammell
Represented By
Aaron J Stewart
contact info
M Daniel Weitman
contact info
Defendant
Anita Trammell
Represented By
Aaron J Stewart
contact info
M Daniel Weitman
contact info
non-party
Oklahoma Attorney General
Represented By
Aaron J Stewart
contact info
non-party
Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Represented By
Aaron J Stewart
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie Fretland
Represented By
Brady R Henderson
Acl Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Ryan D Kiesel
Aclu Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Lee B Rowland
American Civil Liberties Union - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Guardian US
Represented By
Brady R Henderson
Acl Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Ryan D Kiesel
Aclu Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Lee B Rowland
American Civil Liberties Union - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Arnold Hamilton
Represented By
Brady R Henderson
Acl Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Ryan D Kiesel
Aclu Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Lee B Rowland
American Civil Liberties Union - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Oklahoma Observer
Represented By
Brady R Henderson
Acl Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Ryan D Kiesel
Aclu Of Oklahoma Foundation
contact info
Lee B Rowland
American Civil Liberties Union - Ny
contact info


1. Judge Dismisses Lawsuit on Oklahoma Execution Access (koco.com)
Submitted Mon 12/22/2014
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 09, 2015
49 49 order Judgment Fri 01/09 1:16 PM
JUDGMENT in accordance with order48 and no amended complaint having been filed judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs as to all claims...plaintiffs' federal claims are dismissed with prejudice...plaintiffs' claims under the Oklahoma Constitution are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/09/2015. (lam)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
48 48 25 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Fri 12/19 10:19 AM
ORDER for the reasons stated in this order plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction23 is denied and defendant's motion to dismiss32 is granted; plaintiffs' claims arising under the First Amendment are dismissed; plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days if they elect to do so...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/19/2014. (lam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 04, 2014
47 47 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 12/04 3:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Joe Heaton...oral arguments from counsel heard as to32 defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint; and23 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injuction; court to enter written order; court adjourned. (Court Reporter Jeanne Ring) (lam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
46 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Robert Patton, Anita Trammell. (Weitman, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
45 45 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Eugene Joseph Senat Jr.) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
44 44 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Austin D. Sarat) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
43 43 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Michael L. Radelet) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
42 42 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Arnold Hamilton) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
41 41 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Matt Wells) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
40 40 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re38 Response to Motion (Decl. of Katie Fretland) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
39 39 SUPPLEMENT re38 Response to Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
38 38 RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 06, 2014
37 37 ORDER Setting Hearing on plaintiffs' motion23 for preliminary injunction; and defendants' motion32 to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint...motions hearing set: 12/04/2014 @ 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom No. 304. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/06/2014. (lam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
36 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 28, 2014
35 35 RESPONSE to Motion re23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Patton, Anita Trammell.(Weitman, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1/29/2014 - Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint in Taylor v. Apothocare Shoppe,
Att: 3 Exhibit 10/04/2013 Compounding Pharmacy Ltr,
Att: 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Crow
Friday, October 24, 2014
34 34 NOTICE (other) by State of Oklahoma, ex rel., Oklahoma Attorney General(Stewart, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Orders Setting Executions
33 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron J Stewart on behalf of State of Oklahoma, ex rel., Oklahoma Attorney General (Stewart, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 21, 2014
32 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Robert Patton, Anita Trammell.(Weitman, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Code 2279-2280,
Att: 2 Exhibit Laws 51
Tuesday, October 07, 2014
31 31 MOTION for Hearing re23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
30 30 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Decl. of Eugene Joseph Senat Jr.) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
29 29 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Austin D. Sarat) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
28 28 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Declaration of Michael L. Radelet) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
27 27 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Decl. of Arnold Hamilton) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
26 26 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Decl. of Matt Wells) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
25 25 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re24 Memorandum in Support (Decl. of Katie Fretland) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
24 24 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs.(Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
23 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs.(Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order
22 22 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Decl. of Eugene Joseph Senat Jr.) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
21 21 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Decl. of Austin D. Sarat) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
20 20 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Declaration of Michael L. Radelet) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
19 19 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Decl. of Arnold Hamilton) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
18 18 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Decl. of Matt Wells) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
17 17 DECLARATION by All Plaintiffs re16 Response to Motion (Decl. of Katie Fretland) . (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
16 16 RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs.(Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
15 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A,
Att: 2 Appendix B,
Att: 3 Appendix C
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
14 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Robert Patton, Anita Trammell.(Weitman, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arkansas Times v. Norris (unpublished case),
Att: 2 Exhibit Crim. P. Code of 1908, Sec. 2279-2280,
Att: 3 Exhibit Laws 1951
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
13 13 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Robert Patton, Anita Trammell (Stewart, Aaron)
Related: [-]
12 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron J Stewart on behalf of Robert Patton, Anita Trammell (Stewart, Aaron)
Related: [-]
11 11 ENTRY of Appearance by M Daniel Weitman on behalf of Robert Patton, Anita Trammell (Weitman, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 28, 2014
10 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lee B Rowland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rowland, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
9 9 ORDER granting5 Lee Rowland, Esq., leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/26/2014. (lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2014
8 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan D Kiesel (Kiesel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan D Kiesel (Kiesel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan D Kiesel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kiesel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lee Rowland Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-1917562 by All Plaintiffs.(Henderson, Brady)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Lee Rowland's Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice
4 4 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiffs to file an entry of appearance not later than 08/27/2014. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/25/2014. (lam)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brady R Henderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henderson, Brady)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Patton, Anita Trammell. (pw)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Robert Patton, Anita Trammell filed by Oklahoma Observer, Arnold Hamilton, Katie Fretland, Guardian US.(pw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Procedures for the Execution of Offenders Sentenced to Death,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-1917418. (Henderson, Brady)
Related: [-]