Vogel v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn L Huff |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-01986 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 12:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Office Depot, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Martin Vogel
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC
Terminated: 11/04/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 12/02 1:12 PM
ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/2/2014.(ag)(jrd) |
|
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/01 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martin Vogel (Hubbard, Scottlynn) (ag). |
|
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Martin Vogel (Hubbard, Scottlynn) (ag). | |
Tuesday, November 04, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC. The Court dismisses the complaint as to Defendant Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/04/2014.(ag) | |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martin Vogel as to defendant Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC (Hubbard, Scottlynn) (ag). | |
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Granting5 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC answer due 11/13/2014. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/14/2014. (ag) | |
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC. (McMahon, Craig)Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC(pty:dft) (ag). | |
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Vogel. Office Depot, Inc. served. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) (ag). | |
Tuesday, September 23, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Vogel. Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC served. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) (ag). | |
Monday, August 25, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1). | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc., Southbay Marketplace Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-7324870), filed by Martin Vogel.. The new case number is 3:14-cv-1986-H-KSC. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hubbard, Scottlynn)(dls)(av1). | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |