Member Case
Lead case is: 9:22-bk-90000

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 9:22-bk-90002
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2022
Terminated:Jan 18, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC
5005 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy Ste 700
Dallas, TX 75244-6145
Represented By
Michael Angel Garza
Vinson & Elkins
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
6 6 order Final decree Wed 01/18 2:01 PM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 1/18/2023 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 13, 2022
5 5 court BNC certificate of mailing Mon 03/14 12:13 AM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 3/23/2022. Schedule D due 3/23/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/23/2022. Schedule G due 3/23/2022. Schedule H due 3/23/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 3/23/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/23/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/23/2022. Creditor matrix due 3/14/2022.
Friday, March 11, 2022
4 4 order Joint administration Fri 03/11 6:01 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:22-bk-90000 with member case 9:22-bk-90002 Related [+] Entered on 3/11/2022. (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Fri 03/11 8:33 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 3/23/2022. Schedule D due 3/23/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/23/2022. Schedule G due 3/23/2022. Schedule H due 3/23/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 3/23/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/23/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/23/2022. Creditor matrix due 3/14/2022. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
2 2 motion Joint administration Wed 03/09 2:09 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 22-90000 22-90001 22-90002 22-90003 22-90004 22-90005 22-90006 22-90007 22-90008 22-90009 22-90010 22-90011 22-90012 22-90013 22-90014 22-90015 Filed by Debtor Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC (Garza, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Wed 03/09 10:29 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Petro Harvester Operating Company, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/7/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 07/7/2022. (Garza, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 03/09 12:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 22-90002 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A29381413, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case assigned Wed 03/09 4:27 PM
Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. (Colwell, Robert)
Related: [-]