Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-11122

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:22-ap-01075
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mladen-Roko Rasin
17 Farragut Dr.
Brick, NJ 08723
Represented By
Mladen-Roko Rasin
contact info
Plaintiff
Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
989 Lenox Drive Suite 101
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648
Represented By
Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman
Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, June 13, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 06/14 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
23 23 order To Close Case Tue 06/11 11:18 AM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 3:2022-ap-1075-CMG). Reason: Dismissed or settled without entry of judgment. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/11/2024. (rms)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 06/11 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 22-01075 CMG) Closed. (rms)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 03, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 09/04 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 09/04 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 09/01 9:23 AM
Order Denying Cross Motion Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/1/2023. (rms)
Related: [-] 18 Objection to (related document:14 Motion to Reopen Case re: Other Filed by Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman.Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Proposed Order) (dmi) filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman) filed by Mladen-Roko Rasin. (rms) filed by Defendant Mladen-Roko Rasin
19 19 order Reopen Case Fri 09/01 9:16 AM
Order Reopening Adversary Proceeding No. 22-01075 CMG and Enforcing Paragraph 2(a) of the Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/1/2023. (rms)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
court Hearing Held Tue 08/29 1:39 PM
Minute of 8/29/2023, Outcome: GRANTED Related [+] (rms)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case re: Other Filed by Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman.Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #2 Certificate of Service #3 Certificate of Service #4 Proposed Order) Filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
Thursday, August 24, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/24 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (pbf)
Related: [-] 15 Reply Certification in support of (related document:14 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman) filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (pbf) filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman,16 Letter Brief in support of (related document:14 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman) filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (pbf) filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
16 16 misc Support Thu 08/24 2:27 PM
Letter Brief in support of Related [+] filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (pbf)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
15 15 misc Support Thu 08/24 2:25 PM
Reply Certification in support of Related [+] filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (pbf)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
18 18 answer Objection Fri 08/25 3:16 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Mladen-Roko Rasin. (rms)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case re: Other Filed by Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman.Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Proposed Order) (dmi) filed by Plaintiff Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
utility Case Assigned Wed 08/09 11:06 AM
Judge Christine M. Gravelle added to case (dmi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
14 14 motion Reopen Case Wed 08/09 1:09 PM
Motion to Reopen Case re: Other Filed by Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman.Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (dmi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, April 17, 2023
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 04/17 4:07 PM
Adversary Case (3:22-ap-1075) Closed. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 03/31 4:30 PM
Stipulation Between Mladen-Roko Rasin and Plaintiff, re:Settlement filed by Robert L. Schmidt on behalf of Mladen-Roko Rasin. (Schmidt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 03/04 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
10 10 order File Settlement Documents Wed 03/01 9:32 AM
ORDER TO FILE SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/1/2023. Settlement Documents deadline is 3/31/2023. (bwj)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 03/01 9:03 AM
Minute of 3/1/2023 OUTCOME: SETTLED Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 7 Joint Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
court Hearing Held Tue 05/17 3:22 PM
Minute of 5/17/22; OUTCOME: MEDIATION ORDER AND JOINT ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND TRIAL ENTERED Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Sunday, May 15, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 05/16 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 05/16 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
7 7 order Joint Scheduling Order Fri 05/13 2:15 PM
JOINT ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND TRIAL. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/12/2022. Discovery due by 9/15/2022. Trial date set for 3/1/2023 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Mediation Order Fri 05/13 2:12 PM
Mediation Order. Andrew J. Kelly added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/12/2022. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/03 3:16 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/3/22 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, April 08, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/08 11:52 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Robert L. Schmidt on behalf of Mladen-Roko Rasin. (Schmidt, Robert)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Robert L. Schmidt on behalf of Mladen-Roko Rasin. filed by Defendant Mladen-Roko Rasin
Thursday, April 07, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/07 6:02 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Robert L. Schmidt on behalf of Mladen-Roko Rasin. (Schmidt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/16 8:53 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Pellettieri, Rabstein & Altman on behalf of Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman. (mrg)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman for Service on Mladen-Roko Rasin Answer due on 4/7/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/3/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (mjb)
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 03/08 2:46 PM
Summons Issued to Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman for Service on Mladen-Roko Rasin Answer due on 4/7/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/3/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Friday, March 04, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/08 2:24 PM
Adversary case 22-01075 Complaint by Pellettieri Rabstein & Altman against Mladen-Roko Rasin. Receipt Number 624719, Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (mjb) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2022 (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]