New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:22-cv-01308
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 05, 2022 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Karl Darwish
Defendant
Albert Shayek
Defendant
Bed Bath n more Inc
Plaintiff
Angel Carreon
Represented By
Lina Stillman
Stillman Legal, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nelvy Xiomara Sosa
Represented By
Lina Stillman
Stillman Legal, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/04 3:15 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE dated 10/4/22 Notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/4/2022 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/03 8:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Order(Other) Thu 09/15 9:48 AM
ORDER: The Court directed Plaintiffs to file the applicable request for relief regarding their intent to dismiss this action or to file a status report by 08/24/2022. ( See 08/10/2022 Order.) To date, Plaintiffs have not complied with this deadline. The Court therefore sua sponte extends this deadline to 09/30/2022 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 09/15/2022. (Dao, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
order Order(Other) Wed 08/10 12:55 PM
ORDER re16 : Plaintiffs report their intent to dismiss this action and refile in the District of New Jersey based on Plaintiffs' work location in New Jersey. Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate request for relief OR a status report by 08/24/2022 . All remaining deadlines are adjourned sine die . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 08/10/2022. (Heery-Hyatt, Micaela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Wed 07/27 8:00 PM
Letter From Plaintiffs by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/06 11:42 AM
ORDER: In light of Defendants' Bed Bath n more Inc, Karl Darwish, and Albert Sayek's failure to appear or answer, Plaintiff shall seek a Certificate of Default by 07/27/2022 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/06/2022. (Heery-Hyatt, Micaela)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/18 7:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelvy Xiomara Sosa, Angel Carreon. Karl Darwish served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022; Albert Shayek served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/15 9:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelvy Xiomara Sosa, Angel Carreon. Bed Bath n more Inc served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 03/11 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Karl Darwish. (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 03/11 2:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Bed Bath n more Inc. (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 03/11 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Albert Shayek. (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
10 10 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/10 11:04 AM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/10 11:02 AM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/10 11:00 AM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/10 10:16 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 03/10 10:15 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/10 10:14 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Thu 03/10 10:17 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The CLERK OF COURT name needs to be updated/corrected., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/09 6:48 PM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/09 6:46 PM
by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/09 6:43 PM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/09 6:39 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Angel Carreon, Nelvy Xiomara Sosa (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/09 6:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Bed Bath n more Inc, Karl Darwish, Albert Shayek filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15362520 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Nelvy Xiomara Sosa, Angel Carreon. (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]