New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:22-cv-01309
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2022
Terminated:Jul 19, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 05, 2022 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC
Represented By
Jenna Eurell
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Ana Shields
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Bailey
Represented By
Peter Arcadio Romero
Law Office Of Peter A. Romero PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Talavera
Represented By
Peter Arcadio Romero
Law Office Of Peter A. Romero PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/19 9:34 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE -- As stipulated and agreed by and between the parties in the12 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed on July 18, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, without costs, expenses, or fees against any party. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 7/19/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/18 11:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/12 1:05 PM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 05/27 10:30 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for an extension in light of settlement. The time for the parties to submit the Rule 26(f) statement is extended until July 27, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/27/2022. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
11 11 motion Settlement Thu 05/26 3:55 PM
Letter MOTION for Settlement (Settlement in Principle) by Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC. (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/10 3:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by June 10, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/10/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) form
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/10 10:58 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/10 10:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/15 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Eurell on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Eurell, Jenna)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/15 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Shields on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Shields, Ana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/14 12:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Talavera, Vanessa Bailey. Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/10 10:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 03/10 10:22 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/10 10:17 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/10 10:20 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/09 6:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Garden City Jeep Chrysler Dodge, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15362536 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jessica Talavera. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons