Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03498
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2022
Re-opened:Jun 27, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CONNERY EARL
Represented By
RACHAL GARCIA ROJAS
D Miller & Associates - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, June 27, 2022
4 4 5 pgs order Order Reopening Case Mon 06/27 9:29 AM
ORDER - The motions for relief from judgment/motions for reconsideration and reinstatement filed by the plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to REOPEN the cases identified in Exhibit A and return them to the docket of the Court. Additionally, any plaintiff on Exhibit A who has not already submitted a DD214 or DoD Military Service Information Report must do so within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/27/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 06/02 9:24 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 MOTION for Reconsideration re2 Order Dismissing Case, (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
3 3 motion Reconsideration Wed 06/01 6:29 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re2 Order Dismissing Case, by CONNERY EARL. (ROJAS, RACHAL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Supplement Brief in Support
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/09 8:49 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/10 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6800868.), filed by CONNERY EARL. (ROJAS, RACHAL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet