Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:22-cv-00197
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseComputer Fraud and Abuse Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2022 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Kelly Boutell
Represented By
Mark L Phillips
Law Office Of Mark L Phillips LLC
contact info
Lucas B Terna PHV
Sweeney Scharkey And Blanchard LLC
contact info
John J Scharkey PHV, III
Sweeney Scharkey And Blanchard LLC
contact info
Miscellaneous Party
Erin Hanig
Plaintiff
Peoplelink, LLC
Represented By
David Ongaro PHV
Ongaro PC
contact info
Justin A Allen
Ogletree Deakins - Ind/in
contact info
Joanne C Chan PHV
Ongaro PC
contact info
Erin Linder Hanig
Southbank Legal: Ladue Curran & Kuehn
contact info
John A Drake
Ogletree Deakins - Ind/in
contact info
Harris S Freier PHV
Genova Burns
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Thu 07/28 9:34 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to59 STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/28/22. (dk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
59 59 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Wed 07/27 3:26 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Kelly Boutell. (Phillips, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
58 58 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 07/22 12:00 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Kelly Boutell. (Phillips, Mark)
Related: [-]