New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:22-cv-01331
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2022
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2022 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Linda B Bammann
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen B Burke
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Todd Anthony Combs
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Schine Crown
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Dimon
Represented By
Alison Sher
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Patrick Flynn
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mellody Louise Hobson
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By
Alison Sher
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant
Michael A Neal
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Phebe N Novakovic
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Virginia M Rometty
Represented By
Brad S. Karp
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Loretta Lynch
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Audra J. Soloway
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lase Guaranty Trust
Represented By
David Corey Katz
Weisslaw LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2024
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Lase may file a motion seeking leave to file an amended complaint within thirty days. Any such motion should include the proposed amended complaint as an exhibit in accordance with this court's individual rules and practices. If Lase does not seek leave to amend within thirty days, judgment shall enter, and the case shall be closed. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/14/2024. (CAM)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
37 37 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 10/29 9:56 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: that this case is dismissed. Signed by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on behalf of Clerk of Court, Brenna B. Mahoney, on 10/29/2024. (JP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/28 1:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff did not seek leave to amend the complaint within thirty days of the Memorandum and Order entered on March 14, 2024. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mark this action closed and enter judgment. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 10/28/2024. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
36 36 20 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/14 6:09 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER : The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Lase may file a motion seeking leave to file an amended complaint within thirty days. Any such motion should include the proposed amended complaint as an exhibit in accordance with this court's individual rules and practices. If Lase does not seek leave to amend within thirty days, judgment shall enter, and the case shall be closed. ORDER ATTACHED . Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/14/2024. (CAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Wed 02/14 2:19 PM
Letter to Honorable Eric R. Komitee by Lase Guaranty Trust (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Wed 02/07 6:44 PM
Letter Re: Notice of Supplemental Authority by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Decision
Monday, November 13, 2023
33 33 respoth Reply in Support Mon 11/13 5:39 PM
REPLY in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/09 6:01 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
32 32 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/31 11:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand Declaration of David C. Katz in Further Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Lase Guaranty Trust. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SEC Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - CFTC Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - JP Morgan Chase Proxy,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Transcript
31 31 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 10/31 11:04 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re30 Memorandum in Support, Supplemental Memorandum in Further Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Lase Guaranty Trust. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
30 30 27 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 10/10 6:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
29 29 misc Transcript Mon 09/11 2:50 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 8, 2023, before Judge Komitee. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/2/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2023. (LH)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
28 28 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 09/08 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric R. Komitee: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2023 re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand . Case called. Discussions held. As discussed on the record, defendants' brief is due on or before October 10, 2023. Plaintiff's response is to be submitted by October 31, 2023. Defendants' reply, if any, is due on or before November 13, 2023. (FTR Log #10:07-11:35) (VM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/08 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lase Guaranty Trust (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
26 26 misc Letter Fri 07/28 11:00 AM
Letter Request Adjournment of Oral Argument by Lase Guaranty Trust (Rubin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 07/28 12:07 PM
ORDER re26 Letter Request Adjournment of Oral Argument by Lase Guaranty Trust -- The request is granted on consent. Oral Argument previously scheduled for August 3, 2023, is rescheduled to September 8, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 7/28/2023. (AG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 07/21 4:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- Oral Argument previously scheduled for August 3, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. is rescheduled to begin at 10:00 a.m. on the same date. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 7/21/2023. (AG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 06/02 6:11 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint -- Oral Argument will be held on August 3, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6G North. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 6/2/2023. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
25 25 respoth Reply in Support Thu 12/01 5:24 PM
REPLY in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
24 24 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Thu 11/10 6:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Lase Guaranty Trust. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
23 23 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/26 10:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cease-and-Desist Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Instituting Proceedings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - JPMorgan's Restated Certificate of Incorporation
22 22 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 09/26 9:53 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 09/26 9:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Trial Litigation Demand by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
order Order(Other) Wed 09/21 5:47 PM
ORDER re17 Letter, filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jamie Dimon -- The stipulation, Docket entry17 -1, is so ordered. Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1 shall be briefed as follows: motion due by September 26, 2022; response by November 1, 2022; and reply, if any, by December 1, 2022. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 9/21/2022. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
20 20 misc Letter Wed 09/14 5:01 PM
Letter to Judge Komitee Re Recusal by Lase Guaranty Trust (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
19 19 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 09/09 2:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric R. Komitee: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/9/2022. The Court discussed certain aspects of its relationship to JPMorgan and advised that it does not believe recusal is required under the circumstances. Plaintiff shall submit a letter, as discussed, by the close of business on September 15, 2022. (AT&T Teleconference Bridge.) (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
18 18 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/06 4:57 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lase Guaranty Trust (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, August 29, 2022
order Scheduling Order Mon 08/29 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference in this case is scheduled for September 9, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss (1) the appropriate order in which to brief the Rule 23.1 motion and any motions under Rule 12 and (2) whether venue in this District is proper, as opposed to the Southern District of New York. The parties are directed to call 888-808-6929 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 564-7824. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 8/29/2022. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
17 17 misc Letter Fri 08/19 1:16 PM
Letter | Joint Letter from Counsel for all parties to Judge Komittee seeking entry of the enclosed Joint Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 11, 2022
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/11 6:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED VERIFIED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty, filed by Lase Guaranty Trust. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
15 15 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 06/27 6:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cease-and-Desist Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Instituting Proceedings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - JPMorgan's Restated Certificate of Incorporation
14 14 26 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 06/27 6:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Litigation Demand filed by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 06/27 6:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to Make a Pre-Litigation Demand by Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/27 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Audra J. Soloway on behalf of Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty (aty to be noticed) (Soloway, Audra)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/27 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Loretta Lynch on behalf of Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty (aty to be noticed) (Lynch, Loretta)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/27 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brad S. Karp on behalf of Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty (aty to be noticed) (Karp, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
order Order(Other) Mon 06/13 6:24 PM
ORDER re8 Letter, filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., Jamie Dimon -- The Court has reviewed the parties' proposed schedule for motion practice or filing an answer and amends the schedule as follows: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than June 27, 2022; Plaintiff shall serve an opposition, if any, or otherwise amend the Complaint no later than August 11, 2022; and Defendants shall reply, if they choose, no later than August 25, 2022. As a courtesy to the Court, the parties are encouraged not to file their motion papers and submit courtesy copies until the motion has been fully briefed, unless doing so might cause a party to miss a statutory deadline. See Rule III.C.2 this Court's Individual Practices and Rules. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 6/13/2022. (Guy, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/07 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Sher on behalf of Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase & Co. (aty to be noticed) (Sher, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
8 8 misc Letter Fri 06/03 10:59 PM
Letter | Joint Letter from Counsel for all parties to Judge Komittee seeking entry of the enclosed Joint Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/03 10:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase & Co. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/03 10:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase & Co. (aty to be noticed) (Youngwood, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/11 9:17 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 03/11 9:17 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/11 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/11/2022) Rider
Thursday, March 10, 2022
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/10 6:37 PM
Proposed Summons. by Lase Guaranty Trust (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants List for Issuance of Summons
1 1 62 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/10 6:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Linda B Bammann, Stephen B Burke, Todd Anthony Combs, James Schine Crown, Jamie Dimon, Timothy Patrick Flynn, Mellody Louise Hobson, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Michael A Neal, Phebe N Novakovic, Virginia M Rometty filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15366831 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Lase Guaranty Trust. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Client Verification,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/11 9:11 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]