Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00128
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2022
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 17, 2022 6:46 AM CDT
Defendant
John Grooms (1)
Represented By
Anjali Biala
Federal Defender Program
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Malgorzata Tracz Kozaka
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2022
PROTECTIVE Order as to John Grooms governing discovery. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 03/11/2022. Mailed notice (lxk, )
GPO Apr 22 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order as to John Grooms. Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 4/22/2022. Mailed notice (lxs, )

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 8:58 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
1 1 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to John Grooms (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, 5. (td, )
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (td, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani as to John Grooms: To issue bench warrant. The Government will seek to have the defendant detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 3142. The District Court Clerk's Office is directed to disclose to the Assistant U.S. Attorney assigned to this case for the Government the name of the judge, magistrate judge, and docket number assigned to this case in order to expedite arraignment of the arrested defendant. Prior to sealing, the Government requests that one (1) copy of the arrest warrant and filed indictment be provided to Special Assistant U.S. Attorney Malgorzata Kozaka (malgorzata.kozaka@usdoj.gov) and to Investigating Law Enforcement Agent, Special Agent Edward Augustus Goodman (eagoodman@fbi.gov), in order to execute the arrest of the defendant. This indictment is to remain sealed until the defendant is arrested, or until further order of the Court. (td, )
Related: [-]
5 5 BENCH WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to John Grooms. (td, )
Related: [-]