Original Case: 2:21-cv-00229

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-55254
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2022
Terminated:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 03, 2023 1:34 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
MARTIN J. WALSH, Secretaryof Labor
Represented By
Matthew J. Smock
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By
Matthew J. Smock
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PERSIAN BROADCAST SERVICE GLOBAL, INC., a California corporation
Represented By
Ira J. Nasserian
Law Offices of Ira J. Nasserian & Associ
contact info

GPO Aug 01 2023
FILED OPINION (N. RANDY SMITH, KENNETH K. LEE and LAWRENCE VANDYKE) AFFIRMED. Judge: LVD Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12765582]

Docket last updated: 08/03/2023 1:27 AM PDT
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Persian Broadcast Service Global, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/16/2022. Transcript ordered by 04/06/2022. Transcript due 05/06/2022. Appellant Persian Broadcast Service Global, Inc. opening brief due 06/15/2022. Appellees U.S. Department of Labor and Martin J. Walsh answering brief due 07/15/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12390689] (HH) [Entered: 03/09/2022 02:31 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet