Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 8:22-cv-00617
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2022
Terminated:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2022 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Ciox Health, LLC
120 Bluegrass Valley Parkway
Alpharetta, GA 30005
Represented By
Jerrold A Thrope
Gordon Feinblatt LLC
contact info
Gilad Bendheim
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Jay P Lefkowitz
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Pugh
On Own Behalf and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated 1443 Southern Avenue Apt. 202
Oxon Hill, MD 20745
Represented By
Lauren Monica Geisser
Gilman & Bedigian LLC
contact info
Richard S Gordon
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd
contact info
Charles A Gilman
Gilman & Bedigian, LLC
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Assaid
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Veronica Stewart
On Own Behalf and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated 3305 Mondawmin Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21216
Represented By
Lauren Monica Geisser
Gilman & Bedigian LLC
contact info
Richard S Gordon
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd
contact info
Charles A Gilman
Gilman & Bedigian, LLC
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Assaid
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Narvell Nines
Represented By
Lauren Monica Geisser
Gilman & Bedigian LLC
contact info
Richard S Gordon
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd
contact info
Charles A Gilman
Gilman & Bedigian, LLC
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Assaid
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Peter McCabe
Terminated: 04/04/2022
CIOX Health, LLC 120 Bluegrass Valley Parkway
Alpharetta, GA 30005
Represented By
Jerrold A Thrope
Gordon Feinblatt LLC
contact info
Jay P Lefkowitz
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 24 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/24/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
order Order Tue 09/26 2:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/26/2023. (tb2s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
53 53 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/22 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Narvell Nines, Charles Pugh, Veronica Stewart (Gordon, Richard)
Related: [-]