Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:22-cv-00057
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2022 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Pietrangelo
Pietrangelo Smith, PLC
contact info
Jessica Malloy-Thorpe
Miller & Martin, Pllc (chattanooga)
contact info
Bradford G Harvey
Miller & Martin, Pllc (chattanooga)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanza Freeman
Represented By
Jacqueline Strong Moss
Strong Moss Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
35 35 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Wed 07/26 11:47 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Tanza Freeman Against Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC by Tanza Freeman. (Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
34 34 order Judgment Tue 07/18 1:24 PM
JUDGMENT, entered by the Clerk, re 32 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment in favor of Tanza Freeman against Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC (ABF)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/18 1:21 PM
ORDER re 32 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Tanza Freeman: Accordingly, because the parties have completed all that is procedurally required pursuant to Rule 68, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ENTER judgment in this matter in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the sum of $15,000, which includes all amounts to which plaintiff may be entitled, including damages, costs, and attorneys fees. There being no issues remaining for the Court to resolve, the Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case after judgment is entered. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/18/23. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Thu 07/13 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Tanza Freeman(Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Offer of Judgment,
Att: 2 Other Proof of Service
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/05 3:49 PM
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. By agreement of the parties and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's motion to extend expert disclosure deadlines is GRANTED; (2) the Scheduling Order [Doc. 21] is AMENDED to allow Plaintiff an additional 30 days (by July 26, 2023) to disclose expert witness testimony pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2); (3) Defendant shall have 30 days from July 26, 2023, to disclose its expert witness testimony; and (4) except as specifically set forth herein, the remaining deadlines and instructions contained in the Court's Scheduling Order [Doc. 21] remain in full force and effect. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/5/2023. (Steger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Tue 06/27 10:44 AM
Informational only.Administrative Notice to Counsel29 Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadlines . (SAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/26 4:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadlines by Tanza Freeman.(Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Agreed Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/18 2:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadlines by Tanza Freeman.(Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Agreed Order
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/18 5:14 PM
ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 27 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for a 30 day extension of the expert disclosure deadlines established by the Court's Scheduling Orders [Docs. 21 and 13]. Accordingly, Plaintiff's expert disclosures are due on June 26, 2023, and Defendant's are due 30 days thereafter. Rebuttal disclosures are due 30 days after the disclosure made by the other party. All other requirements of Doc. 13, Paragraph 3(e) remain in full effect. This Order does not extend any other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Orders. All other unexpired deadlines remain in full effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5-18-23. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 05/03 3:12 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/3/23. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
25 25 motion Protective Order Thu 04/13 4:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC.(Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
24 24 adr Report of Mediation Wed 04/05 4:30 PM
REPORT of Mediation. (AWS)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/05 12:07 PM
ORDER granting 22 Motion to to remove Attorney Strong-Moss as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Attorney Brandy-Spurgin-Floyd has been acting as sole counsel of record for Plaintiff Tanza Freeman; accordingly, Ms. Spurgin-Floyd is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Jacqueline Strong Moss. The Clerk of Court shall note that Ms. Strong-Moss is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-5-23. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/04 1:38 PM
MOTION to remove Jacqueline Strong Moss as counsel of record by Tanza Freeman. (Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 01/31 4:55 PM
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Continue. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/17/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Jury Trial reset for 10/24/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/31/23. (JBR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 01/30 10:35 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Report on Mediation) by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC. (Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
19 19 motion Continue Wed 01/25 4:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Tanza Freeman. (Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandy Lachelle Spurgin-Floyd on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spurgin-Floyd, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Wed 05/18 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT To Magistrate by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC (Pietrangelo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 05/16 4:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pietrangelo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/27 10:27 AM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-27-22. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/26 9:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony C. Pietrangelo ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5043866.) by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC.(Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 04/26 11:22 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony C. Pietrangelo ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5043866.) filed by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC as to Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/20 2:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/20/22. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 04/15 4:30 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on April 15, 2022. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/12 8:47 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 12, 2022. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/Non-Consent Form
order Order of Recusal Tue 04/12 9:48 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 04/12/2022. (KRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
9 9 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Mon 04/11 12:18 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC. (Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/11 12:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC.(Harvey, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 04/06 8:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanza Freeman. Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC served on 3/21/2022.(Strong Moss, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FedEx271010541908
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 03/15 11:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Support Solutions of the Mid-South, LLC. (LCK)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Tue 03/15 11:40 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/15/2022. (LCK)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Tue 03/15 11:40 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/15/2022. (LCK)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Tue 03/15 11:39 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/15/2022. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 13, 2022
2 2 cmp Complaint Sun 03/13 9:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Tanza Freeman ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5003615.), filed by Tanza Freeman.(Strong Moss, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Other
Friday, March 11, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/11 9:12 PM
COMPLAINT 1-22-cv-57 against Tanza Freeman ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5003547.), filed by Tanza Freeman.(Strong Moss, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/15 11:34 AM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (LCK)
Related: [-]