California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Case #: 8:22-cv-00371
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2022
Terminated:Dec 26, 2023

Debtor
Dana Kim Shelton

,
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2022 2:38 AM PDT
Appellant
Daniel Keith Larson
Beneficiary, Lender, Creditor and Trustee 6670 El Pomar Drive
Templeton, CA 93465
Appellee
Dana Kim Shelton
Represented By
Christopher Paul Walker
Law Office Of Christopher P Walker PC
contact info
Christopher P. Walker
Law Office Of Christopher P Walker PC
contact info
Trustee
Richard A. Marshack
Represented By
Misty A Perry Isaacson
Pagter And Perry Isaacson, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 18, 2024
39 39 order Extension of Time to File Mon 03/18 11:04 AM
ORDER DENYING APPELLANTS' EX PARTE PETITIONS [ECF Nos. 53 &38 ] by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Instant Ex Parte Applications are DENIED. The parties are DIRECTED to review this Courts orders, including its Standing Order, as well as the Local Rules, to ensure compliance before filing any future ex parte requests for relief. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details)(yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 03/15 11:24 AM
VERIFIED EX-PARTE PETITION AND DECLARATION FOR 60 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROPERLY AND ADEQUATELY RESPOND TO JUDGE JOHN HOLCOMB'S ORDER DENYING APPELLANTS' EX PARTE PETITIONS filed by Plaintiff Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
37 37 order For Order Tue 03/12 3:39 PM
ORDER DENYING APPELLANTSEX PARTE PETITIONS [ECFNos. 50 &36 ] by Judge John W. Holcomb. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Applications are DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 02, 2024
36 36 30+ pgs motion Order Tue 03/05 2:01 PM
VERIFIED NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION Petition and Ex Parte Petition to Vacate and Set-Aside Bankruptcy Order and District Court Memorandum Opinion RE Appeal From Order of the Bankruptcy Court for Contempt Against Erin Ellen Larson' For Violation of the Bankruptcy Discharge Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Petitioners; Petitioners' Exhibits; Complete Court Record FRCP 60(b)(3)(4)(6); FRCP 12(h)(3); 28 USC §157(b)(1); 11 USC §541(c)(2); Cal.Code Civ.Pro §473(d); Article III, §1: US Const.; 28 US Code §1359 filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
35 35 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 02/20 2:18 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING RECORD ON APPEAL by Judge John W. Holcomb. On the Court's own motion, the deadline for Larson to file a response to the Court's Order-including a proper record for appealis EXTENDED to March 15, 2024. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 11, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/13 3:35 PM
Verified Submission of Hyperlinked Complete Docket Record Re Bankruptcy Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
33 33 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/10 11:13 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the Ex Parte Application filed by Debtor Daniel Keith Larson [ECF No. 32], and it is hereby APPROVED. The deadline for Mr. Larson to file a response to the Court Order issued on December 26, 2023 [ECF No. 31] is EXTENDED to February 12, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/08 2:23 PM
VERIFIED EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING REQUEST for 30 day Extension of Time to File a Response Regarding Court order entered on 12/28/2023 filed by Debtor Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
31 31 order Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/28 9:49 AM
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: (1) Larsen's Appeal is DISMISSED without prejudice. (2) The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively, but Larsen may seek to reopen the case and reinstate the appeal upon the submission of a complete record. (3) If Larsen has not submitted a complete record in support of the appeal by 1/12/2024, then the Court will DISMISS Larsen's appeal with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
30 30 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Mon 03/27 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, document29 was inadvertently docketed twice in this case. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
29 29 3 pgs motion Order Fri 03/24 11:47 AM
REQUEST FOR PROOF OF SERVICE OR NOTICE FROM THIS COURT filed by appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs motion Order Wed 03/22 3:23 PM
REQUEST FOR PROOF OF SERVICE OR NOTICE FROM THIS COURT filed by appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/22 3:20 PM
NOTICE FROM THIS COURT OF ALL FUTURE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS IN THIS COURT filed by appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 01/09 10:55 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court is in receipt of Appellants Reply Brief [ECF No. 25] filed on Friday, January 6, 2023. In view of the various court closures during the holidays, the Court ACCEPTS the filing as timely. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
25 25 bankruptcy Appellants Reply Brief Mon 01/09 10:16 AM
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
24 24 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 11/30 10:03 AM
Text Only Order GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief20 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court EXTENDS the deadline to file Appellant's Reply to December 30, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
22 22 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Tue 11/08 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief20 (dve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
23 23 5 pgs motion Order Wed 11/09 2:49 PM
Verified Ex-parte application REAppellant's first request for extension of time to file Appellant's reply brief;Declaration of Daniel Keith Larson filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (lom)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 11/07 8:51 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by mail on 10/22/22 to Richard Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee filed by Plaintiff Daniel Keith Larson, re Appellant's EX PARTE APPLICATION for First Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief20 . (lom)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/07 8:47 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for First Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
19 19 bankruptcy Appellees Reply Brief Tue 10/11 1:09 PM
APPELLEES REPLY BRIEF filed by Trustee Richard A. Marshack.(Perry Isaacson, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appellee's Excerpts of Record
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 09/28 9:06 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge John W. Holcomb: In view of Appellant's Opening Brief filed on August 17, 2022 [ECF No. 17, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [ECF No. 16], issued on September 1, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/01 3:41 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge John W. Holcomb. Appellant is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing on or before 9/16/2022, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the Court's order. The failure of Appellant to make an adequate and/or timely response to this Order will result in the dismissal of the appeal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
17 17 bankruptcy Appellants Opening Brief Thu 09/08 3:37 PM
APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH VERIFIED MANDATORY DECLARATION OF DANIEL KEITH LARSON REGARDING DECEDENT BARBARA ANNE LARSON PURSUANT TO SECTION 377.32 OF THE CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 07/05 9:58 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed Appellants First Request for Extension of Time to File Appellants Opening Brief [ECF No. 14] and construes the Request as an Ex Parte Application for that relief. No objection or opposition has been filed. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Appellants Application and EXTENDS the deadline for Appellant to file his Opening Brief to August 23, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 06/29 4:27 PM
FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Granting (CV 104A) Wed 06/29 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb ORDERING First request for extension of time to file appellant's opening brief submitted by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson received on 6/21/2022 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
12 12 bankruptcy Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form Thu 05/26 12:29 PM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 6/24/2022. (lom)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Thu 05/26 12:27 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,1 , Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary)2 , Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26)4 , Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal)9 . The undersigned deputy clerk of the US Bankruptcy Court certifies that the record on appeal is complete and is available electronically on the case docket. All transcripts requested by either the Appellant, Appellee, or both, have been filed with this court. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 05/19 1:41 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
9 9 bankruptcy Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) Thu 05/12 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of transcript forwarded. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
8 8 misc Declaration Wed 04/06 1:32 PM
VERIFIED MANDATORY DECLARATION OF DANIEL KEITH LARSOON REGARDINGDECEDENT BARBARA ANNE CARSON filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/25 3:54 PM
NOTICE Regarding the Ordering of Transcripts Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
6 6 misc Amended Document (Non-Motion) Wed 03/23 4:00 PM
CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION1 filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson Re: Order Granting Motion by Trustee for Sanctions Against Daniel K. Larson filed and entered 2/23/2022; Order on Trustee's Motion for Approval of Cash Disbursements filed and entered 2/22/2022 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott C Clarkson, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 3/22/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:17-bk-12887-SC, Adversary number: 8:18-ap-01006-SC, BAP case number: N/A. filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/11 9:32 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
4 4 bankruptcy Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form Fri 03/11 9:31 AM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/11 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES IN APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 bankruptcy Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) - Bankruptcy Fri 03/11 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 3/7/2022. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Fri 03/11 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Daniel Keith Larson Re: Order Granting Motion by Trustee for Sanctions Against Daniel K. Larson dated 2/23/2022; Order Granting Trustees Cash Disbursement dated 2/15/2022 entered on 2/23/2022 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott C Clarkson, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 3/4/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:17-bk-12887, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BK Docket