California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:22-cv-01664
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2022
Terminated:Sep 21, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2022 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Diamondboi Designs
Plaintiff
Tacori Enterprises
Represented By
Jacqueline Relatores
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Howard A Kroll
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
25 25 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Wed 09/21 2:37 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). Mailed closing report to Copyright Office. (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 09/21 2:36 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/21 2:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal22 . and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/21 10:19 AM
Notice filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/02 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement20 , indicating that the parties have agreed to settle this matter in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status.By October 12, 2022, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All other dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Settlement Fri 09/02 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
19 19 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Thu 08/18 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:In view of Plaintiffs Response, (ECF No. 17), the Courts Order to Show Cause, (ECF No. 16), is hereby DISCHARGED. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to theComplaint by September 12, 2022. (lc)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 08/17 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard A Kroll counsel for Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. Jacqueline D. Relatores is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TACORI ENTERPRISES. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Response Wed 08/17 9:34 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprisesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,16 (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/16 11:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than August 17, 2022 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.Answer by the defendant(s). Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/30 11:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In view of Plaintiff's Waiver of Service14 , the Court's Order to Show Cause13 is hereby DISCHARGED. (lc) Modified on 6/30/2022 (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/29 9:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. upon Diamondboi Designs waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/13/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Sarah Guske. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/15 5:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, no later than June 29, 2022, why the Court should not dismiss this action based on Plaintiffs failure to serve theComplaint within the Rule 4(m) period. The Court will discharge this order upon the filing of a timely proof of service or a demonstration of good cause why timely service has not been made, supported by declaration under penalty of perjury. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may result in the dismissal of the action without further warning. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 03/15 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who havepending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/14 2:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Diamondboi Designs. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/14 1:21 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/14 1:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/14 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/14 11:58 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/14 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises, (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 03/14 11:54 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 03/14 11:53 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/14 11:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 03/14 11:49 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. (Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/14 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32939751 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tacori Enterprises. (Attorney Howard A Kroll added to party Tacori Enterprises(pty:pla))(Kroll, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registrations,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Registration No. 3,728,425,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Infringing Rings