Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 3:22-cv-00029
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2022
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2022 5:42 AM EDT
Claimant
SHANICIOUS COOPER
Represented By
JESS B JOHNSON
contact info
Defendant
CURRENCY
Defendant
GUNS
Defendant
JEWELRY
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
MIKE MORRISON
contact info
SEAN DEITRICK
contact info

GPO Aug 02 2022
DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to the First-Named Defendant Property in the amount of five hundred eighty-five thousand, six hundred thirty-eight dollars ($585,638.00). (ggs)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
32 32 order Judgment Mon 12/02 3:07 PM
JUDGMENT (aen)
Related: [-]
31 31 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 12/02 2:24 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Properties. The Second through the Fourth Named Defendant Properties are hereby dismissed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/02/2024. (aen)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss Mon 12/02 1:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Second through Fourth-Named Defendant Properties from the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by MICHAEL P MORRILL.(MORRILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 12:23 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Lift Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/25/2024. (aen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/21 5:02 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by MICHAEL P MORRILL.(MORRILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 respoth Response to Court Order Thu 11/21 4:54 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 26 Order to Show Cause, (MORRILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
26 26 order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/13 11:10 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within 14 days of today, the parties shall show cause as to why the stay in this action should not be lifted. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/13/2024. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
25 25 respoth Response to Court Order Mon 07/22 4:30 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 24 Order to Show Cause, (MORRILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
24 24 order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/15 10:35 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within seven days of today's order, the parties shall show cause why the stay entered on July 21, 2022 should not be lifted. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/15/2024. (CCL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/21 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL P MORRILL on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Attorney MICHAEL P MORRILL added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla)(MORRILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
22 22 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/25 11:08 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JESS B JOHNSON terminated. Claimant Shanicious Cooper is now pro se; any filings should be served on her at her last known address, 5229 Mill Way Stone Mountain, Georgia 30083. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/25/2023 (CCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 07/24 1:59 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SHANICIOUS COOPER filed by JESS B JOHNSON.(JOHNSON, JESS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Withdraw,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email with Attached Notice of Intent to Withdraw,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of Delivery
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
20 20 8 pgs misc Status Report Tue 06/13 5:03 PM
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/12 12:37 PM
NOTICE Notification Certificate Regarding Notice of Intent to Withdraw as Counsel by SHANICIOUS COOPER(JOHNSON, JESS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
18 18 2 pgs service USM285 Process Receipt and Return Tue 08/09 11:50 AM
USM285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds). (DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 08/02 10:26 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to the First-Named Defendant Property in the amount of five hundred eighty-five thousand, six hundred thirty-eight dollars ($585,638.00). (ggs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/21 12:43 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/21/2022 (tam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Tue 07/19 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 11/16/2022. Dispositive motions due by 1/3/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/19/2022. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
14 14 motion Default Judgment Tue 07/05 11:02 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Claimants as to the Remaining Portion of the First-Named Defendant Property. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by SEAN DEITRICK.(DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
13 13 motion Stay Wed 06/22 6:03 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to the Second through the Fourth-Named Defendant Properties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by SEAN DEITRICK.(DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
order Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/15 8:39 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds) - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
12 12 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Tue 06/14 8:36 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds)(DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Affidavit for Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt, Track and Confirm printout, and FedEx printout for Albert Ross and Central Station Sports Restaurant, LLC,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt, Return, and Track and Confirm printout for Shanicious Cooper,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt and Return for Levonder Moore and Central Station Sports Restaurant, LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt and Return for Central Station Sports Restaurant, LLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipts, Track and Confirm Printouts, and FedEx printout for Lakisha Sakera Wilcox and Central Station Sports Restaurant, LLC,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt and Track and Confirm printout for Kenyarda Shandoe Wilcox,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipt, Track and Confirm printout, and FedEx printouts for Damir Hurtic,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Affidavit- Copies of the Certified Mail Receipts, Return, and Track and Confirm printout for Toby Darnell Harris,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to Affidavit- Copies of the Military Status Reports,
Att: 11 Proposed Entry of Default
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 06/14 8:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SEAN DEITRICK on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Attorney SEAN DEITRICK added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla)(DEITRICK, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 06/09 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of a Portion of the First-Named Defendant Property by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds)(MORRISON, MIKE) Modified on 6/9/2022 to edit text. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
9 9 misc Declaration of Publication (Government Only) Wed 06/01 3:05 PM
Declaration of Publication (FINAL) by United States of America(MORRISON, MIKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Publication Report
Monday, May 23, 2022
8 8 10 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 05/23 9:45 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/4/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/23/2022. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/20 10:41 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Forfeiture, by SHANICIOUS COOPERE with Jury Demand.(JOHNSON, JESS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 05/03 8:24 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. ADDITIONALLY , the signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only, necessary corrections made by case manager . See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(ggs)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Shanicious Cooper
Monday, May 02, 2022
6 6 respoth Claim for Forfeiture Mon 05/02 5:35 PM
CLAIM for Forfeiture by Shanicious Cooper. (JOHNSON, JESS)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/02 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JESS B JOHNSON on behalf of Shanicious Cooper Attorney JESS B JOHNSON added to party Shanicious Cooper(pty:clm)(JOHNSON, JESS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/30 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Proceedings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (MORRISON, MIKE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
3 3 service USM285 Process Receipt and Return Mon 03/21 1:44 PM
USM285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CURRENCY($302,477.00 in United States Funds), CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds). (MORRISON, MIKE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
2 2 service Warrant of Arrest In Rem Tue 03/15 8:33 AM
WARRANT issued to ARREST property in rem (ggs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
1 1 misc Complaint for Forfeiture Mon 03/14 6:43 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against CURRENCY($302,477.00 in United States Funds), CURRENCY($625,638.00 in United States Funds), GUNS, JEWELRY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(MORRISON, MIKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Verification,
Att: 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem