CONNECTED GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC v. USA
U.S. Court of Federal Claims | |
Judge: | David A Tapp |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00292 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1491 Tucker Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2022 5:08 AM EDT |
Consolidated Plaintiff
AMERICAN ROLL-ON ROLL-OFF CARRIER GROUP INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC
601 Jefferson St #3435a
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONNECTED GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/28/2022 12:39 PM EST |
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |