Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:22-cv-00098
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Malibu Boats, LLC
Represented By
Eamonn Gardner
Cooley Llp - Colorado
contact info
Allison E Elkman
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
Matthew M Googe
Robinson Ip Law, PLLC
contact info
Stephen R Smith
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
Plaintiff
MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC
Represented By
James Issac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Andrew Kutas
Venable LLP
contact info
Edmund J Haughey
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/07 11:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC. (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/04 5:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Malibu Boats, LLC. (Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/28 12:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC.(Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Declaration of Edmund J. Haughey in Support of MasterCraft Boat Company LLC's Opposition to Malibu Boats, LLC's Motion to Consolidate,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration - 2022 Malibu Boats Wakesetter 25 LSV for sale,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration - 2022 Malibu Boats M-Series M240 for sale,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration - '230 Patent Cited References,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration - '746, '045, and '205 Patent Cited References
Thursday, July 21, 2022
order Order Thu 07/21 5:01 PM
ORDER re 26 Order,, Set Hearings, In light of the pending Motion to Consolidate Cases [Doc. 30], and the parties indication that the motion will be opposed [Doc. 31], the telephonic scheduling conference in this matter is hereby CANCELED. The Court will reschedule this conference following a decision on the Motion to Consolidate. [Doc. 30]. This entry is the complete Order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/21/22. (EES)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
31 31 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 07/18 12:28 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Addendum to Scheduling Order
Thursday, July 14, 2022
30 30 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 07/14 7:50 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Malibu Boats, LLC.(Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew M. Googe in Support of Motion to Consolidate,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Friday, July 08, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/08 9:06 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 7/8/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 7/8/2022 to indicate c/m to Allison E Elkman, Cooley LLP - Washington, 1299 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W, Suite 700, Washington, DC 20004-2400 (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/07 11:19 AM
NOTICE by Malibu Boats, LLC re21 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), Certificate of Good Standing for Allison E. Elkman (Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Thu 07/07 12:57 PM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison E. Elkman (AYB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Tue 07/05 5:56 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/16 11:32 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2022 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/16/22. (KFB) Modified on 6/16/2022 (KFB). Serviced via US Mail to Allison Elkman-Cooley LLP-Washington/1299 Pennsylvania Ave NW/Suite 700/Washington DC 2004-2400. Eamonn Gardner Cooley LLP (CO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
misc Public Docket Annotation Wed 06/15 10:12 AM
Robinson IP Law, PLLC contacted the Clerk's Office on this day to inform the Court that the Certificate of Good Standing from a District Court for Attorney Allison E. Elkman would be forwarded to the Clerk's Office as soon as it is received from the District Court. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 06/08 3:50 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/8/22. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/08 3:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Malibu Boats, LLC.(Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/07 9:01 AM
NOTICE by Malibu Boats, LLC re20 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen R. Smith (Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 06/07 10:47 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (18 in 3:22-cv-00099-TAV-JEM) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073205.) filed by Malibu Boats, LLC, (18 in 3:22-cv-00098-CEA-DCP) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073197.) filed by Malibu Boats, LLC (JBR)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/07 12:09 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] ; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/7/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 05/31 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (19 in 3:22-cv-00099-TAV-JEM) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison E. Elkman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073206.), (19 in 3:22-cv-00098-CEA-DCP) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison E. Elkman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073199.) : A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. (c/m to Allison Elkman) (ABF)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 05/31 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (18 in 3:22-cv-00099-TAV-JEM) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073205.), (18 in 3:22-cv-00098-CEA-DCP) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073197.) : A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. (c/m to Stephen R. Smith) (ABF)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 05/31 8:53 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eamonn Gardner ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073195.) filed by Malibu Boats, LLC (ABF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/27 5:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison E. Elkman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073199.) by Malibu Boats, LLC.(Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/27 5:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073197.) by Malibu Boats, LLC.(Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/27 5:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eamonn Gardner ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5073195.) by Malibu Boats, LLC.(Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/27 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Googe on behalf of Malibu Boats, LLC (Googe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 05/17 1:55 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Deadline by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC. (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/27 4:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit 1, Disclosure Statement, Form AO 120, Order Governing Depositions, Order Governing Mitions to Dismiss, Mem and Order Regarding Sealing Confidential Information served on Malibu Boats on April 27, 2022, filed by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC. (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/18 9:40 AM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] ; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/18/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Thu 03/17 8:23 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Kutas ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5007724.) filed by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC, 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edmund J. Haughey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5007720.) filed by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/16 7:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Kutas ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5007724.) by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC.(Kutas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/16 7:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edmund J. Haughey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5007720.) by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC.(Haughey, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
10 10 misc Patent and Trademark Notice Tue 03/15 2:48 PM
PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding US11091230 . (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Tue 03/15 1:27 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/15/2022. (JCK)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Tue 03/15 1:26 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/15/2022. (JCK)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Tue 03/15 1:26 PM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/15/2022. (JCK)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Tue 03/15 1:25 PM
Administrative Notice to Counsel re AO120 Patent Notice. Please refile the Patent notice seperately usind the event Patent and Trademark Notice found under the category Other Documents. Requirements due by 3/21/2022 . (JCK)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 03/15 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Andrew Kutas and Edmund Haughey are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vic (JCK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (PDF) Tue 03/15 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re1 Summons, (JCK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/15 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Malibu Boats, LLC. (JCK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Tue 03/15 10:40 AM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC. (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/15 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5005240.), filed by MasterCraft Boat Company, LLC.(Sanders, James) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/15/2022) (JCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - US11091230,
Att: 3 1 pgs Other AO 120,
Att: 4 Summons Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/15 1:17 PM
District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
Related: [-]