New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Referred: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Case #: 1:22-cv-02123
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:May 02, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Lagos Lounge Inc.
Defendant
John-Paul Wadibia
Plaintiff
Antonio Estrada
Represented By
Bryan David Robinson, Jr
Csm Legal P. C.
contact info
Catalina Sojo
Csm Legal P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
misc Received Returned Mail Wed 05/10 3:01 PM
Received returned mail re:41 Order. Mail was addressed to John-Paul Wadibia at 306 East 49th Street, New York, New York 10017 and was returned for the following reason(s): RETURN TO SENDER. NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. UNABLE TO FORWARD..(mde)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
misc Received Returned Mail Tue 05/09 4:26 PM
Received returned mail re:41 Order. Mail was addressed to Lagos Lounge Inc., at 306 East 49th Street, New York, New York 10017 and was returned for the following reason(s): RETURN TO SENDER. NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. UNABLE TO FORWARD...(mde)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
42 42 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 05/02 4:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:41 Order40 Report and Recommendations in favor of Antonio Estrada against Lagos Lounge Inc., John-Paul Wadibia in the amount of $83,687.82. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated May 2, 2023, the court has received and reviewed the Report and Recommendation received on April 3, 2023, from The Hon. Gabriel W. Gorenstein U.S.M.J. No objections have been received. The court has accepted the recommendation of the learned Magistrate Judge and has adopted the Report as its opinion. Judgment is entered as follows: 1. Damages to plaintiff in the total amount of $79,701.12. 2. Attorneys fees in the amount of $3,030, in accordance with the chart on page 19 or 21 of the Report and Recommendation. 3. Costs in the amount of $947.36. 4. Pre-judgment interest at the rate of $9.34 per day for every day after May 1, 2023 prior to the entry of judgment (so if judgment is entered on May 2, pre-judgment interest of $9.34; if on May 3, pre-judgment interest of $18.68; etc.). If any portion of the judgment remains unpaid upon the expiration of ninety days from the date judgment is entered, or ninety days after the expiration of the time to appeal if no appeal is then pending, whichever is later, the total amount of the judgment then outstanding shall automatically increase by 15% per N.Y. Labor Law§ 198(4); accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/2/2023) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
41 41 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/02 3:42 PM
ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: The court has received and reviewed the Report and Recommendation received on April 3, 2023, from The Hon. Gabriel W. Gorenstein U.S.M.J. No objections have been received. The court accepts the recommendation of the learned Magistrate Judge and adopts the Report as its opinion. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment as follows: 1. Damages to plaintiff in the total amount of $79,701.12. 2. Attorneys fees in the amount of $3,030, in accordance with the chart on page 19 or 21 of the Report and Recommendation. 3. Costs in the amount of $947.36. 4. Pre-judgment interest at the rate of $9.34 per day for every day after May 1, 2023 prior to the entry of judgment (so if judgment is entered on May 2, pre-judgment interest of $9.34; if on May 3, pre-judgment interest of $18.68; etc.). If any portion of the judgment remains unpaid upon the expiration of ninety days from the date judgment is entered, or ninety days after the expiration of the time to appeal if no appeal is then pending, whichever is later, the total amount of the judgment then outstanding shall automatically increase by 15% per N.Y. Labor Law§ 198(4). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/2/2023) Copies Mailed By Chambers. BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL BY FIRST CLASS MAIL TO LAGOS LOUNGE INC AND JOHN-PAUL WADIBIA AT 306 East 49th Street, New York, New York 10017. (kv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
40 40 order Report and Recommendations Mon 04/03 12:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: re:1 Complaint filed by Antonio Estrada. For the foregoing reasons, judgment should be entered against the defendants in the amount of $79,701.12, plus interest to be calculated by the Clerk of the Court at a rate of $9.34 per day from May 2, 2021, until the date judgment is entered. The text of the judgment should provide that if the judgment is not entirely paid within 90 days of judgment, or 90 days after the expiration of appeal, whichever is later, and no appeal is pending, then the total amount of judgment shall automatically increase by 15 percent. Objections to R&R due by 4/17/2023 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/03/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
39 39 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 12/22 3:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DAMAGES INQUEST dated October 6, 2022 (Dkt. No. 29), the AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT dated October 10, 2022 (Dkt. No. 30), ORDER dated December 05, 2022 (Dkt. No. 31), PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW dated December 07, 2022 (Dkt. No. 32), MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law dated December 07, 2022 (Dkt. No. 33), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE dated December 09, 2022 (0kt. No. 34), ORDER (Dkt. No. 35), LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law dated December 15, 2022 (Dkt. No. 36), ORDER granting 36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time dated December 15, 2022, and AMENDED PROPOSED FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW dated December 22, 2022 (Dkt. No. 38) served on LAGOS LOUNGE INC. (D/B/A LAGOS LOUNGE RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE), JOHN-PAUL WADIBIA on 12/22/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
38 38 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Thu 12/22 3:11 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Filed Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Plaintiff Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit- D- Attorney Catalina Sojo's Lagos Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Damages Chart,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Attorney's Bill,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G- Invoices,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H- Bryan D. Robinson's Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I- Catalina Sojos Declaraion
Thursday, December 15, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/15 4:41 PM
ORDER granting36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requested extension is granted nunc pro tunc. Any supplement to the plaintiff's submission shall be filed by December 22, 2022. Any response by defendants to plaintiff's request for damages shall be filed by January 23, 2023. Plaintiff shall serve defendants (by mail at the last known address) with a copy of any future filings as well as a copy of this Order. Proof of such service shall be filed by December 22, 2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/15/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/15 2:01 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Bryan Robinson dated December 15, 2022. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 12/13 1:14 PM
ORDER: The Court is mystified as to why plaintiff would fail to comply with the Court's Order of December 5, 2022 (Docket # 31). Plaintiff is directed to file the application required by Docket # 31 by December 16, 2022. If counsel fails to do so, the documents filed as Docket ## 32-34 will be stricken as untimely and this case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The Court notes that in the event that Docket ## 32-34 are not stricken, they suffer the same defect that was previously noted in the filings in the case of Urena v. 0325 Tuta Corp., 20 Civ. 3751 (e.g., Docket ## 88, 93, 95, 97). If plaintiff wishes to cure this defect, he is free to supplement the filing provided (a) the Court grants the motion for an extension and (b) the supplemental filing is made within 5 days of any Court Order granting the extension. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 12/16/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/13/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
34 34 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 12/09 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein Order dated October 06, 2022 (Dkt. No. 29), Plaintiff Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law (with Exhibits) (Dkt. No. 32), and the Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law (Dkt. No. 33) served on LAGOS LOUNGE INC (D/B/A LAGOS LOUNGE RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE), JOHN-PAUL WADIBIA on 12/8/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
33 33 14 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Wed 12/07 5:14 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:32 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law . Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Filed Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Service Lagos Lounge Inc.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Service Defendant John Paul Wadibia,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Certificates of Default,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Signed Declaration of Plaintiff Antonio Estrada,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Damages Chart,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G- Attorney's Bill
32 32 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Wed 12/07 5:04 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/05 11:21 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order of October 6, 2022 (Docket # 29) inasmuch as he has not timely filed the materials required by that Order. Plaintiff is granted until December 9, 2022, to file an application under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) to extend the deadline in the October 6, 2022, Order. If plaintiff fails to timely file such an application, this case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 12/9/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/05/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Other Mon 10/10 5:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT dated September 29, 2022 (Dkt. No. 27), ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, dated October 6, 2022 (Dkt No. 28), and the SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DAMAGES INQUEST dated October 6, 2022 (Dkt No. 29) served on LAGOS LOUNGE INC. (D/B/A LAGOS RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE) and JOHN-PAUL WADIBIA on October 6, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
29 29 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/06 4:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DAMAGES INQUEST: This matter having been referred to me to conduct an inquest and to report and recommend concerning plaintiff's damages, it is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall serve defendants (by mail at the last known address) and file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law concerning all damages and any other monetary relief permitted under the entry of default (or default judgment) no later than November 11, 2022 Plaintiff shall include with such service a copy of this Order. Defendant shall send to plaintiff's counsel and file with the Court their response, if any, to plaintiff's submissions no later than December 21, 2022. An extra copy of any document filed with the Court shall be sent or delivered to the following address: Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl StreetNew York, NY 10007-1581. The Court notes that the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Room 230, New York, New York ((212) 805-0175) may be of assistance to the defendant in connection with court procedures. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 11/11/2022. Responses due by 12/21/2022 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/06/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/06 1:27 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Inquest After Default/Damages Hearing. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/6/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 09/29 4:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting19 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (Docket #19) is GRANTED, and that a judgment of liability be entered against Defendants, and each of them, and that this matter be referred to The Hon. Gabriel Gorenstein, U.S.M.J., for an inquest into damages.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/29/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSELBY EMAIL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE GORENSTEIN (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
26 26 order Memo Endorsement Tue 09/27 5:33 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:25 Letter, filed by Antonio Estrada. ENDORSEMENT: Thank you. We will consider the declaration as appended to your motion. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/27/2022) (mml)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Tue 09/27 2:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Catalina Sojo dated September 27, 2022 re: Order dated September 13, 2022 (Dkt. 24). Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 09/13 4:16 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT with respect to19 Motion for Default Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: An affidavit from counsel is not admissible evidence. This is not state court. The complaint is not verified. Please get the plaintiff to testify that the facts pleaded in the complaint or in his attorneys affidavit are true (if they are). Then and only then will the court consider this motion. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/13/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Mon 06/27 12:01 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. 21 Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 06/24 5:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, all supporting documents regarding the Default Judgment, and the proposed judgment served on John-Paul Wadibia on June 22, 2022. Service was accepted by Sam A.. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 06/24 5:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, all supporting documents regarding the Default Judgment, and the proposed judgment served on Lagos Lounge Inc. on June 17, 2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Proposed Default Judgment Fri 06/24 5:28 PM
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/24 5:27 PM
DECLARATION of Catalina Sojo in Support re:19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to .. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Service of Complaint Lagos Lounge Inc,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service of Complaint on Defendant John-Paul Wadibia,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Certificates of Default,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-SIGNED Declaration of Plaintiff Antonio Estrada,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Damages Chart,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Attorney's Bill
19 19 motion Default Judgment Fri 06/24 5:21 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
18 18 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 2:33 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to LAGOS LOUNGE INC. D/B/A LAGOS RESTAURANT AND BAR. (tp)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 2:17 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 2:11 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to JOHN-PAUL WADIBIA. (tp)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Thu 06/09 10:57 AM
AFFIRMATION of Catalina Sojo in Support re:14 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 10:56 AM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 10:55 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 6/9/2022 (tp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Thu 06/09 2:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Catalina Sojo. RE-FILE Document No. 13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong person who accepted service. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct person who accepted service - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 06/06 4:02 PM
ORDER terminating11 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. You don't have to ask my permission to file a motion.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/6/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Fri 06/03 3:23 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Default Judgment addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Bryan Robinson dated June 3, 2022. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/06 3:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. John-Paul Wadibia served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. Service was accepted by Brooke Bryan. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually); Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 03/28 1:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lagos Lounge Inc. served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually); Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/16 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan David Robinson, Jr on behalf of Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Robinson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/16 4:03 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 6/23/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/16/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/16 11:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John-Paul Wadibia. (sj)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/16 11:12 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lagos Lounge Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/16 11:08 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/16 11:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/16 11:10 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/15 12:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John-Paul Wadibia, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/15 12:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lagos Lounge Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/15 12:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/15 12:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Lagos Lounge Inc., John-Paul Wadibia. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25862215)Document filed by Antonio Estrada(Individually), Antonio Estrada(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]