Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03838
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
FRANCO SYDNOR
Represented By
BASIL E ADHAM
Johnson Law Group - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 12, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/17 3:10 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/12/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/15 10:34 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/15 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6817357.), filed by FRANCO SYDNOR. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]