Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-03881
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GIGLIO
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON
Environmental Litigation Group Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/10 8:19 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/16 8:26 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER While opening civil case the party names were added to the docket incorrectly by adding first and last name in the last name field. Please enter names in the correct fields. Names will be corrected by the clerk. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/15 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6818847.), filed by MICHAEL GIGLIO. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet