Illinois Central District Court
Judge:James E Shadid
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:22-cv-01075
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2022
Terminated:Apr 14, 2023
Case in other court:Illinois Southern, 3:21-cv-01583
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 06, 2022 3:27 AM CDT
Plaintiff
Gage Moore
Represented By
Ryan M Furniss
The Furniss Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Joshua Miller
The Furniss Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Respondent
Advanced Technology Services Inc
Represented By
David G Lubben
Davis & Campbell LLC
contact info
Julie Noel
Davis & Campbell LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 14, 2023
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/14 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gage Moore. (Miller, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 04/14 3:59 PM
Remark: Civil case terminated pursuant to39 Stipulation of Dismissal. (FDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/15 1:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via video by Atty Joshua Miller for the Plaintiff and Attys David Lubben and Julie Noel for Settlement Conference held on 3/15/2023. Settlement reached. Parties to file a Stipulation to Dismiss by 4/14/2023. All previously set deadlines and hearings are vacated and pending motions are moot. Recording of settlement terms held in the Clerk's Office sealed folder. (FDS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
38 38 audio Auto docketing digital audio upload Fri 02/17 10:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [02/17/2023 10:00:00 AM]. File Size [ 4173 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:42 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
minutes Presettlement Conference Fri 02/17 10:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone conference with Attorney Joshua Miller on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney David Lubben on behalf of Defendant for Pre-Settlement Conference Hearing held 2/17/2023. Discussion held regarding procedures and expectations regarding Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2023. (Tape #PRC: 10:00 a.m.) (AH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 01/24 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Settlement Conference is set for 3/15/2023 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Participants can log into the video hearing using the Zoom application or Zoom.com and entering the following Meeting ID: 16009516536. The Court will admit you from the waiting room once the hearing is ready to begin. For those participating by telephone, call (551) 285-1373 and enter the Meeting ID when prompted to do so. Parties to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement stating their position in regard to settlement by 3/10/2023. This shall include history of offers and demands along with a brief statement of position on facts and legal issues. Do not file this statement with the clerk office or exchange with opposing parties. Parties have leave of court to email the statement directly to chambers at hawley@ilcd.uscourts.gov. A pre-settlement Status Conference is set for 2/17/23 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley to discuss the preparation and the Court's expectations for the settlement conference. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling call (551) 285-1373, then enter 16009516536. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered: 1/24/2023. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/20 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Settlement Conference is set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Participants can log into the video hearing using the Zoom application or Zoom.com and entering the following Meeting ID: 16009516536. The Court will admit you from the waiting room once the hearing is ready to begin. For those participating by telephone, call (551) 285-1373 and enter the Meeting ID when prompted to do so. Parties to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement stating their position in regard to settlement by 3/27/2023. This shall include history of offers and demands along with a brief statement of position on facts and legal issues. Do not file this statement with the clerk office or exchange with opposing parties. Parties have leave of court to email the statement directly to chambers at hawley@ilcd.uscourts.gov. A pre-settlement Status Conference is set for 3/17/23 at 10:15 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley to discuss the preparation and the Court's expectations for the settlement conference. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling call (551) 285-1373, then enter 16009516536. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered: 1/20/2023. (WG)
Related: [-]
order Order Striking/Vacating Document (NOT a motion) 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/20 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT TEXT Order setting Settlement conference for 3/30/23. This Text Order was erroneously docketed in the wrong case. Pre-settlement conference on 3/17/23 and Settlement conference on 3/30/23 are vacated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/20/23. (WG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/20 10:02 AM
TEXT ORDER granting37 Consent motion requesting settlement conference. Chambers to contact counsel of record and select a mutually agreeable date for the settlement conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/20/23. (WG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
37 37 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/19 11:38 AM
Consent MOTION Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Gage Moore. Responses due by 2/2/2023(Miller, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
35 35 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 10/06 9:14 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order34 is granted. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/6/2022. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
34 34 motion Protective Order Wed 10/05 9:33 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Respondent Advanced Technology Services Inc. Responses due by 10/19/2022(Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/27 6:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Mandatory Disclosures (Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/27 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 09/27 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Defendant's Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures32 bears the electronic signature of one attorney but was filed under the CM/ECF login of another. This is prohibited. Counsel is directed to review and comply with Civil Local Rule 11.4. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/27/2022. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 09/19 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan30 . Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 3:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom A before Judge Shadid. Rule 16 conference set 9/30/22 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawley's Standing Order that was revised on 4/7/2022. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered: 9/19/2022. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/16 3:01 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by Advanced Technology Services Inc.(Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
30 30 misc Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 09/13 3:07 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Advanced Technology Services Inc. (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/02 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Services Inc, filed by Gage Moore.(Miller, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 09/02 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joshua Miller on behalf of Gage Moore (Miller, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
27 27 18 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16) Wed 08/17 8:58 AM
TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/30/22 at 10:00 AM via telephone . Counsel are to phone into conference by calling (551) 285-1373 and enter the Meeting ID: 16009516536 when prompted to do so. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 9/27/2022. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. If the complaint makes allegations on behalf of a class, the proposed discovery plan should include a deadline for filing a motion to certify class at a stage early in the the case. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/17/2022. (WG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
26 26 24 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/16 10:21 AM
ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/16/2022. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (#23 ) is GRANTED without prejudice as to Counts IV, V, and X (Plaintiff's state law claims for disability discrimination, disability retaliation, and age discrimination) and otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff has 21 days to replead. 2) This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. See full written Order. (JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
25 25 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition Fri 04/22 2:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Gage Moore. (Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
24 24 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition Fri 04/08 3:26 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Respondent Advanced Technology Services Inc. (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/08 3:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Respondent Advanced Technology Services Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2022 (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/28 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Services Inc, filed by Gage Moore.(Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - IDHR Right to Sue
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 03/15 10:49 AM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01583. .
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
20 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Central District of Illinois. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/9/2022. (jdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
19 19 ORDER granting18 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to8 Motion to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's response to8 Motion to Transfer Venue and16 Defendant's Partial Partial Motion to Dismiss is due 3/7/2022. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/14/2022. (jsh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,8 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of Illinois . Responses due by 3/7/2022, per Order at Doc. 19. (kls3)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
18 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,8 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of Illinois by Gage Moore. (Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
17 17 15 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advanced Technology Services, Inc.. (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Advanced Technology Services, Inc.. (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
15 15 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1583-JPG. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
Related: [-]
14 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Noel on behalf of Advanced Technology Services, Inc. (Noel, Julie)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Advanced Technology Services, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Advanced Technology Services, Inc. on 2/2/2022. Consent due by 2/23/2022.(kls3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Lubben on behalf of Advanced Technology Services, Inc. (Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re8 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Advanced Technology Services, Inc. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Lubben does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
Related: [-]
9 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Technology Services, Inc.. (Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of Illinois by Advanced Technology Services, Inc..(Lubben, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Tyler Manning with NDA,
Att: 2 Exhibit Federal court statistics tables
Thursday, January 06, 2022
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gage Moore. Advanced Technology Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
6 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
5 5 NOTICE REGARDING FILING: The Civil Cover Sheet and submitted Request for Waiver of Service are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Gage Moore. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1583-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 12/27/2021. (kls3)
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Advanced Technology Services, Inc. on 12/6/2021 by Gage Moore. Waiver of Service due by 1/5/2022.(Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service Form
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Furniss on behalf of Gage Moore (Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4648832.), filed by Gage Moore.(Furniss, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - IDHR Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet