California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00043
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 17, 2022 12:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (2)
Represented By
Tom Royse Johnson
Anderson & Johnson LLP
contact info
Stacey H. Mitchell, PHV
contact info
Defendant
Kory B. Willis (1)
Represented By
Tom Royse Johnson
Anderson & Johnson LLP
contact info
Stacey H. Mitchell, PHV
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephen J. Foster, GOVT
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Katherine Theresa Lydon, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nirav K. Desai, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Krishna S. Dighe, GOVT
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2022
SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/28/22 SEALING case until further order of the court. (Benson, A.)SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/28/22 SEALING case until further order of the court. (Benson, A.)
GPO Mar 10 2022
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/2022 adding attorney Stacey H. Mitchell, PHV for Kory B. Willis and Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Donati, J)PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/2022 adding attorney Stacey H. Mitchell, PHV for Kory B. Willis and Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Donati, J)
GPO Mar 11 2022
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/11/2022 as to Kory B. Willis. (Cannarozzi, N)ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/11/2022 as to Kory B. Willis. (Cannarozzi, N)
GPO Mar 14 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/14/2022GRANTING 17 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kory B. Willis (1), Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (2). The case and all document shall be UNSEALED except for the 3 Request to Seal. The 3 Request to Seal SHALL REMAIN SEALED. (Donati, J)ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/14/2022GRANTING 17 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kory B. Willis (1), Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (2). The case and all document shall be UNSEALED except for the 3 Request to Seal. The 3 Request to Seal SHALL REMAIN SEALED. (Donati, J)
GPO Mar 18 2022
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/22 as to Kory B. Willis, Power Performance Enterprises, Inc., GRANTING the United States' Motion for the Deposit of Funds Into the Court's Deposit Fund. On or before the date of the defendants' sentencing, the defendants, or any other individual or entity on their behalf, may make payments in partial or full satisfaction of the defendants'criminal monetary penalties ("Deposit") to the Clerk of Court. (Kastilahn, A)ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/22 as to Kory B. Willis, Power Performance Enterprises, Inc., GRANTING the United States' Motion for the Deposit of Funds Into the Court's Deposit Fund. On or before the date of the defendants' sentencing, the defendants, or any other individual or entity on their behalf, may make payments in partial or full satisfaction of the defendants'criminal monetary penalties ("Deposit") to the Clerk of Court. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jul 27 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Kory B. Willis signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/27/2022 TEMPORARILY RETURNING Willis' passport to him. Willis is ORDERED not to travel outside the United States. Willis is ORDERED to send his renewed passport back to the Clerk within 20 days. (Coll, A)
GPO Jul 19 2023
REALTED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/2023 RELATING cases 2:22-cr-00043-JAM USA v. Willis, et al and 2:23-cr-00168-TLN USA v. Sinister Mfg. Company, Inc. (Perdue, C.)REALTED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/2023 RELATING cases 2:22-cr-00043-JAM USA v. Willis, et al and 2:23-cr-00168-TLN USA v. Sinister Mfg. Company, Inc. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Nov 15 2024
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/2024 GRANTING 69 Request to Seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/2024 GRANTING 69 Request to Seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Dec 20 2024
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/2024 as to Kory B. Willis (1). (Alvarez, R.)
GPO Dec 20 2024
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/2024 as to Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (2). (Alvarez, R.)

Docket last updated: 05/17/2023 7:01 AM PDT
Monday, February 28, 2022
1 1 8 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) as to Kory B. Willis (1) counts 1 and 2; Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (2) counts 1 and 2. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to Kory B. Willis, Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST to SEAL by USA as to Kory B. Willis, Power Performance Enterprises, Inc. (Benson, A.) [REMAINS SEALED pursuant to18 Order] Modified on 3/14/2022 (Donati, J).
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/28/22 SEALING case until further order of the court. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]