New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Referred: Gary Stein
Case #: 1:22-cv-02170
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2022
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 12, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
BMF Advance, LLC
Represented By
Brandon James Gibbons
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Steven William Wells
contact info
Mark W Stout
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HOP Capital, LLC
Represented By
Brandon James Gibbons
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Mark W Stout
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ISACCOV Investment, Inc.
Represented By
Steven William Wells
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Yitzchakov a.k.a. Joseph Isaacov
Defendant
Gavriel Yitzchakov
Represented By
Brandon James Gibbons
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Steven William Wells
contact info
Mark W Stout
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Yitzchakov
Represented By
Brandon James Gibbons
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Mark W Stout
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Funderz.net, LLC d/b/a Hop Capital and d/b/a Business Merchant Funding
Defendant
Gavriel Yitzchakov a.k.a. Gabe Isaacov
Represented By
Steven William Wells
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Doe Investors
Plaintiff
Benchmark Builders, Inc.
Represented By
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lateral Recovery LLC
Represented By
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jus-Com LLC
Represented By
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Focus Wireless, LLC
Represented By
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
FTE Networks, Inc.
Represented By
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
193 193 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Thu 04/03 12:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: WHEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: (i) That this matter be administratively closed; (ii) The Court retains jurisdiction to enter the Consent Judgment in the event of a default under the Agreement by Defendants; (iii) In the event of a default, Plaintiffs may move the Court by letter motion to reopen this action for the purpose of entering the Consent Judgment; SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/3/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
192 192 misc Settlement Agreement Thu 04/03 10:57 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES***SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT . Document filed by FTE Networks, Inc., Benchmark Builders, Inc., Jus-Com LLC, Lateral Recovery LLC, Focus Wireless, LLC, Funderz.net, LLC d/b/a Hop Capital and d/b/a Business Merchant Funding, Joseph Yitzchakov a.k.a. Joseph Isaacov.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:189 .(Heskin, Shane)
Related: [-]
191 191 order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 04/03 10:05 AM
ORDER granting189 Letter Motion to Seal. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (bmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
190 190 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 04/02 3:58 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Benchmark Builders, Inc., FTE Networks, Inc., Focus Wireless, LLC, Jus-Com LLC, Lateral Recovery LLC..(Heskin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted Settlement Agreement
189 189 motion Seal Wed 04/02 3:55 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Seal Joint letter Motion to file the March 28, 2025 Release and Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Shane Heskin dated April 2, 2025. Document filed by Benchmark Builders, Inc., FTE Networks, Inc., Focus Wireless, LLC, Jus-Com LLC, Lateral Recovery LLC..(Heskin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted Settlement Agreement
188 188 order Memo Endorsement Wed 04/02 10:17 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:187 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Benchmark Builders, Inc., Lateral Recovery LLC, Jus-Com LLC, Focus Wireless, LLC, FTE Networks, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement without awareness of its terms. The parties may resubmit the proposed stipulation accompanied by a copy of the settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
187 187 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 04/01 4:11 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Benchmark Builders, Inc., FTE Networks, Inc., Focus Wireless, LLC, Jus-Com LLC, Lateral Recovery LLC..(Heskin, Shane)
Related: [-]