Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:22-cv-00423
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2022
Terminated:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 12, 2022 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Fremont Municipal Court
Defendant
Scott Hunter
Plaintiff
Vincent E Henderson, Jr.
1006 June Street
Fremont, OH 43420

GPO Jul 26 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), and the Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Plaintiff's 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/26/2022. Copy sent to Plaintiff Vincent E Henderson, Jr., 1006 June Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 7/26/2022. (B,JL)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
4 4 order Judgment Tue 07/26 3:18 PM
Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the related3 Memorandum Opinion and Order issued this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court further CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/26/2022. Copy sent to Plaintiff Vincent E Henderson, Jr., 1006 June Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 7/26/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 07/26 3:14 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's1 Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), and the Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/26/2022. Copy sent to Plaintiff Vincent E Henderson, Jr., 1006 June Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 7/26/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
order Order reassigning case Thu 03/17 8:29 AM
Order of Recusal. This case was assigned in error and is being returned to the Clerk's Office for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/17/2022. (D,L)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 03/17 8:57 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/16 3:07 PM
Application to proceed in District Court Without prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Plaintiff Vincent E Henderson, Jr. Related document(s)1 . (H,Ch) (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/16/2022) Corrected Motion
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/16 3:01 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Fremont Municipal Court, Scott Hunter. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Vincent E Henderson, Jr. (H,Ch) (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Basis for Jurisdiction,
Att: 2 Deprivation of Rights,
Att: 3 Relief,
Att: 4 FWD Vincent Henderson Statement of Claim,
Att: 5 Fwd Cause of Action for Suit,
Att: 6 Fwd Witness list,
Att: 7 Judge responsibilities,
Att: 8 Independent judiciary
Att: 9 (3/16/2022) Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 03/16 3:03 PM
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 03/16 3:04 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]