New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:11-cr-00655
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2011
Terminated:Nov 20, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2022 4:27 PM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole Ware Friedlander
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Matthew Adam Weinberg
Doj-Usao
contact info
Benjamin Woodside Schrier
Doj-Usao
contact info
Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor
United States Attorney Office, Sdny
contact info
Andrew Daniel Goldstein
Cooley LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pandora Bacon (14)
Terminated: 11/20/2013
Represented By
Frank Paone
Frank Paone, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Gerard Canino (1)
Terminated: 05/30/2013
Represented By
Stuart Neal Kaplan
Kaplan & Sconzo, P.A.
contact info
Harry Conrad Batchelder, Jr.
Law Office Of Harry C. Batchelder Jr.
contact info
David Wikstrom
David Wikstrom
contact info
Defendant
Michael Charles (12)
Terminated: 09/09/2013
Represented By
Bruce A. Barket
Barket Marion Epstein & Kearon, LLP
contact info
Kevin T. Kearon
Law Office Of Kevin T. Kearon
contact info
Defendant
Ralph Delgiorno (13)
Terminated: 05/24/2013
Represented By
Abraham C. Moskowitz
Anderson Kill Olick And Oshinsky
contact info
Avraham Chaim Moskowitz
Moskowitz & Book, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Omar Guzman (3)
Terminated: 01/30/2013
Represented By
Sarah Jane Baumgartel
Yale Law School
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Hymowitz (11)
Terminated: 01/31/2013
Represented By
Judith Vargas
The Law Office Of Judith Vargas
contact info
Defendant
Ian Katz (2)
Terminated: 11/19/2013
Represented By
Jeffrey Chabrowe
Law Office Of Jeffrey Chabrowe
contact info
Defendant
Michael Raphan (8)
Terminated: 12/21/2012
Represented By
Matthew W. Brissenden
Stephen P. Scaring, P.C.
contact info
Stephen P. Scaring
Stephen P. Scaring, P.C.
contact info
Stanley Kopilow
Hopkins & Kopilow
contact info
Defendant
Henry Richards (5)
Terminated: 01/30/2013
Represented By
Richard Harris Rosenberg
Richard H. Rosenberg, Attorney At Law
contact info
Michael Keith Bachrach
Cja Michael K. Bachrach, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Schlussel (9)
Terminated: 12/21/2012
Represented By
David Scott Smith
The Law Offices Of David S. Smith
contact info
Defendant
Neal Sultzer (7)
Terminated: 01/31/2013
Represented By
Joseph Robert Conway
Larusso & Conway, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Thornton (6)
Terminated: 06/21/2013
Represented By
Louis Marmorek Freeman
Freeman Nooter & Ginsberg
contact info
Anthony Strazza
Anthony Strazza, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Jacquelyn Todaro (10)
Terminated: 01/07/2013
Represented By
Adrian L. Diluzio
Adrian L. Diluzio, Esquire
contact info
Kevin James Keating
Kevin J. Keating
contact info
Defendant
James Vignola (4)
Terminated: 03/01/2013
Represented By
Salvatore John Marinello
Salvatore J. Marinello, Esq.,
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2022 4:35 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 03, 2011
Case Designated ECF as to Gerard Canino, Ian Katz, Omar Guzman. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to James Vignola, Henry Richards, Robert Thornton. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Michael Raphan, Neal Sultzer, Michael Schlussel. (jm); Modified on 8/10/2011 (bw).
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Jacquelyn Todaro, Kevin Hymowitz, Michael Charles. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Ralph Delgiorno, Pandora Bacon. (jm)
Related: [-]