Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 3:22-cv-08041
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2022 1:25 AM MST
Defendant
Dan Barrett
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
HP Incorporated
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Enquire Lores
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Grad Rosenbaum
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Christoph Shell
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Tuan A Tran
Represented By
Madeline Averi Cordray
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Annette-Lynn McKenna
Living Woman, Real Party in Interest 658 Brindle Dr
Clarkdale, AZ 86324

GPO May 17 2022
e record. 4. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case. (See document for further details). (LAD)ORDER - 1. The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 22) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc. 25) is denied as moot. 3. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Questions in Support of Complaint (Doc. 28) is granted because the filing is not authorized by any statute, rule, or court order. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to strike the Notice of Questions (Doc. 24) from th

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
31 31 order Clerks Judgment Tue 05/17 9:00 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 17, 2022, which granted the Motion to Dismiss, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. The complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (LAD)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Strike Tue 05/17 8:56 AM
ORDER - 1. The Motion to Dismiss (Doc.22 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc.25 ) is denied as moot. 3. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Questions in Support of Complaint (Doc.28 ) is granted because the filing is not authorized by any statute, rule, or court order. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to strike the Notice of Questions (Doc.24 ) from the record. 4. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case. (See document for further details). (LAD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/16 1:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by Dan Barrett, HP Incorporated, Enquire Lores, Grad Rosenbaum, Christoph Shell, Tuan A Tran. (Sixkiller, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
28 28 motion Strike Fri 05/13 5:00 PM
MOTION to Strike24 Notice (Other) MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF QUESTIONS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT by Dan Barrett, HP Incorporated, Enquire Lores, Grad Rosenbaum, Christoph Shell, Tuan A Tran.(Sixkiller, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, May 02, 2022
27 27 service Service Executed Mon 05/02 1:54 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna: Proof of Service re: Documents 23 thru 26 via RMail upon Laura.Sixkiller@dlapiper.com and madeline.cordray@dlapiper.com on May 1, 2022. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 01, 2022
26 26 respm Response to Motion Sun 05/01 5:06 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/29 1:57 PM
EX PARTE Proposed MOTION by Annette-Lynn McKenna.(McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Allow Electronic Filing of Exhibits
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/29 11:36 AM
NOTICE re: LIST OF QUESTIONS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT by Annette-Lynn McKenna . (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
23 23 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/19 4:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HP Incorporated. (Sixkiller, Laura)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/19 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Dan Barrett, HP Incorporated, Enquire Lores, Grad Rosenbaum, Christoph Shell, Tuan A Tran. (Sixkiller, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
21 21 service Service Executed Mon 04/18 9:10 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna: Certificate of Service re: Summons Revised Certificate of Service with Signature upon All Defendants on 3.29.22 and 4.1.22. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
20 20 service Service Executed Thu 04/07 11:01 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna: Proof of Service re: Summons via Certified Mail with Signature Receipt upon All Defendants on 3.29.22 and 4.1.22. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
19 19 misc Redacted Document Mon 03/28 4:02 PM
REDACTION to10 Amended Complaint, Revised Redacted Exhibit B&C by Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:43 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 33 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:32 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Defendant Consent To Receive Notices Via Electronic Transmission by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:23 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 36 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:21 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 35 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:17 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 34 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:13 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 28 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 03/28 3:07 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Amended Complaint, Exhibit 19 by Plaintiff Annette-Lynn McKenna. (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
11 11 misc Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim) Thu 03/24 2:59 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Annette-Lynn McKenna. Amendment to10 Amended Complaint, Signed Civil Cover Sheet . (McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/24 10:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna.(McKenna, Annette-Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B&C Redacted,
Att: 4 Exhibit List of Exhibits,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
9 9 order Order Wed 03/16 2:32 PM
The Complaint (Doc. 1) contains personally identifying information. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to file the Complaint (Doc. 1) under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall refile a properly redacted version of the Complaint. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing Wed 03/16 1:14 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/16/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Wed 03/16 11:07 AM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/16 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
5 5 misc New Case Opened Wed 03/16 10:48 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX236037. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 22-8041 PCT-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Allow Electronic Filing Wed 03/16 10:41 AM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Annette-Lynn McKenna. (WLP)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Wed 03/16 10:39 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (WLP)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 03/16 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Annette-Lynn McKenna. (WLP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/16 10:37 AM
*COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX236037 filed by Annette-Lynn McKenna.(WLP) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. 9 on 3/16/2022 (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2,
Att: 2 Part 3-1,
Att: 3 Part 3-2,
Att: 4 Part 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet